Ferrie v. Woodford Research LLC et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Ferrie
Defendant: David Peterson, Woodford Research, LLC, Horizon Trust Company, LLC, Hubert Senters, Jeremy Rounsville, Daniel Ensign, Kurt F Weinrich, Sr., Infogenesis Consulting Group, LLC, Jared Carter, Greg Herlean, Karen Arvin, Infogenesis Consulting Group LLC, DPT Innovations LLC, Woodford Research LLC, Ross Givens, Kurt F Weinrich, Sr, Horizon Trust Company LLC and DPT Innovations LLC a foreign company doing business as Arbitraging.co
Defendant / Appellant: DPT Innovations, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv05798
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. re Plaintiff's #44 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Plaintiff hereby dismisses WITH PREJUDICE Defendants Woodford Research LLC, Hubert Senters, Karen Arvin, Ross Givens, and Jared Carter. Defendants Arbitraging.co and David Peterson WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (TH)
October 6, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie (Terrell, Beth)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald B. Leighton is no longer assigned to this case. Judge Leighton is retiring from the federal bench at the end of August and now is an efficient time to pass this case to a new Judge.Entered as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff to file his Second Amended Complaint by 8/20/2020, Woodford Defendants to respond by 9/11/2020; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
August 11, 2020 Filing 41 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie. Noting Date 8/11/2020, (Terrell, Beth)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re #39 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David Silver for Douglas Ferrie, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 22, 2020 Filing 39 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David C. Silver FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6479584 (Terrell, Beth)
July 16, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Infogenesis Consulting Group LLC (a Nevada limited liability company) and Kurt F Weinrich, Sr (an individual), filed by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie. (Terrell, Beth)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #30 Woodford Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
June 30, 2020 Filing 36 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Russell, Robie)
June 24, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Kurt F Weinrich, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Citation, #3 Citation, #4 Citation, #5 Citation, #6 Citation) Noting Date 7/24/2020, (Russell, Robie)
May 8, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY, filed by Defendant Woodford Research LLC, TO RESPONSE to #30 MOTION to Dismiss (McKay, Michael)
May 4, 2020 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Douglas Ferrie filed by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie re #30 MOTION to Dismiss (Terrell, Beth)
May 4, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie, to #30 MOTION to Dismiss . (Terrell, Beth)
April 10, 2020 Filing 31 DECLARATION of H. Senters ISO Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Woodford Research LLC re #30 MOTION to Dismiss (McKay, Michael)
April 10, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Woodford Research LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 5/8/2020, (McKay, Michael)
April 7, 2020 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against defendant(s) Karen Arvin, Jared Carter, DPT Innovations LLC, Ross Givens, Infogenesis Consulting Group LLC, David Peterson, Hubert Senters, Kurt F Weinrich, Sr, Woodford Research LLC, filed by Douglas Ferrie.(Terrell, Beth)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER re #26 MOTION to Amend Complaint for Damages: THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie's Motion for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint. Dkt. #26. The Motion is GRANTED. In addition, the Woodford Defendants' deadline for filing a responsive pleading is extended to 4/10/2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
March 16, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Defendant Woodford Research LLC, to #26 MOTION to Amend Complaint for Damages. (Millstein, Aaron)
March 2, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Amend Complaint for Damages, filed by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Redline Version of Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/20/2020, (Terrell, Beth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE Joint Notice Regarding Status of Mediation Efforts and Request for Status Conference ; filed by Defendants Karen Arvin, Jared Carter, Ross Givens, Hubert Senters, Woodford Research LLC. (Millstein, Aaron)
December 19, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Horizon Trust Company LLC (a foreign limited liability company), Daniel Ensign (an individual) and Greg Herlean (an individual), filed by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie. (Terrell, Beth)
November 19, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Horizon Trust Company LLC (Walter, Marjorie)
November 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Marjorie Alison Walter. Filed by Defendants Greg Herlean, Horizon Trust Company LLC. (Walter, Marjorie)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Stipulated Motion vacating deadlines and staying case until 12/20/19; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
November 14, 2019 Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation, filed by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie. Noting Date 11/14/2019, (Terrell, Beth)
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Horizon Trust Company, LLC on 9/18/2019, filed by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie. (Terrell, Beth)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Infogenesis Consulting Group LLC (Russell, Robie)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion to Extend Time: Greg Herlean answer due 11/8/2019; Horizon Trust Company LLC answer due 11/8/2019; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time by parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walter, Marjorie)
October 8, 2019 Attorney Michael E Kipling added for Greg Herlean and Horizon Trust Company LLC per #16 Notice of Appearance. (ERA)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marjorie Alison Walter on behalf of Defendants Greg Herlean, Horizon Trust Company LLC. (Walter, Marjorie)
October 3, 2019 Attorney Daniel Charles V. Wolf added for the following defendants: Karen Arvin, Jared Carter, Ross Givens, Hubert Senters, and Woodford Research LLC; per #15 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
October 3, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Infogenesis Consulting Group LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/10/2019. (GMR)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aaron E Millstein on behalf of Defendants Karen Arvin, Jared Carter, Ross Givens, Hubert Senters and Woodford Research LLC. (Millstein, Aaron) Modified on 10/3/2019 (GMR).
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER: re #12 Answer to Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ERA)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Trato LLC, Other Affiliate Bienville Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hubert Senters Production LLC for Hubert Senters, Jared Carter, Karen Arvin, Ross Givens, Woodford Research LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Karen Arvin, Jared Carter, Ross Givens, Hubert Senters, Woodford Research LLC (McKay, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, for Damages Attorney Michael D McKay added to party Karen Arvin(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D McKay added to party Jared Carter(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D McKay added to party Ross Givens(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D McKay added to party Hubert Senters(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D McKay added to party Woodford Research LLC(pty:dft) by Karen Arvin, Jared Carter, Ross Givens, Hubert Senters, Woodford Research LLC.(McKay, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robie G Russell on behalf of Defendants Infogenesis Consulting Group LLC, Kurt F Weinrich, Sr. (Russell, Robie)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Woodford Research, LLC on 9/7/2019, filed by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie. (Terrell, Beth)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Hubert Senters on 9/7/2019, filed by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie. (Terrell, Beth)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Lisa Senters on 9/7/2019, filed by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie. (Terrell, Beth)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Karen Arvin on 9/10/2019, filed by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie. (Terrell, Beth)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kurt F. Weinrich, Sr. on 9/7/2019, filed by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie. (Terrell, Beth)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on InfoGenesis Consulting Group on 9/7/2019, filed by Plaintiff Douglas Ferrie. (Terrell, Beth)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/14/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/21/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Karen Arvin, Jared Carter, DPT Innovations LLC, Daniel Ensign, Ross Givens, Greg Herlean, Horizon Trust Company LLC, Infogenesis Consulting Group LLC, David Peterson, Hubert Senters, Kurt F Weinrich, Sr, Woodford Research LLC (main document). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Hubert Senters, #2 Summons - Karen Arvin, #3 Summons - Ross Givens, #4 Summons - Jared Carter, #5 Summons - DPT Innovations LLC, #6 Summons - David Peterson, #7 Summons - Horizon Trust Company LLC, #8 Summons - Greg Herlean, #9 Summons - Daniel Ensign, #10 Summons - Infogenesis Consulting Group LLC, #11 Sumons - Kurt F Weinrich Sr) (ERA)
August 29, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (ERA)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against defendant(s) Karen Arvin, Jared Carter, DPT Innovations, LLC, Daniel Ensign, Greg Herlean, Horizon Trust Company, LLC, Infogenesis Consulting Group, LLC, David Peterson, Hubert Senters, Kurt F Weinrich, Sr., Woodford Research, LLC (Receipt # 0981-5903681) Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party Douglas Ferrie(pty:pla), filed by Douglas Ferrie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Woodford Research LLC, #3 Summons Hubert Senters, #4 Summons Karen Arvin, #5 Summons Ross Givens, #6 Summons Jared Carter, #7 Summons DPT Innovations, LLC, #8 Summons David Peterson, #9 Summons Horizon Trust Company, LLC, #10 Summons Greg Herlean, #11 Summons Daniel Ensign, #12 Summons Infogenesis Consulting Group, #13 Summons Kurt F. Weinrich, Sr.)(Terrell, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrie v. Woodford Research LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodford Research, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Trust Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubert Senters
Represented By: Michael D McKay
Represented By: Aaron E Millstein
Represented By: Daniel Charles V. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Rounsville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Ensign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt F Weinrich, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infogenesis Consulting Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Carter
Represented By: Michael D McKay
Represented By: Aaron E Millstein
Represented By: Daniel Charles V. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Herlean
Represented By: Marjorie Alison Walter
Represented By: Michael E Kipling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Arvin
Represented By: Michael D McKay
Represented By: Aaron E Millstein
Represented By: Daniel Charles V. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infogenesis Consulting Group LLC
Represented By: Robie G Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPT Innovations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodford Research LLC
Represented By: Michael D McKay
Represented By: Aaron E Millstein
Represented By: Daniel Charles V. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Givens
Represented By: Michael D McKay
Represented By: Aaron E Millstein
Represented By: Daniel Charles V. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt F Weinrich, Sr
Represented By: Robie G Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Trust Company LLC
Represented By: Marjorie Alison Walter
Represented By: Michael E Kipling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPT Innovations LLC a foreign company doing business as Arbitraging.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Ferrie
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: David Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DPT Innovations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?