Precision Industrial Contractors Inc v. Jack R. Gage Refrigeration Inc et al
Plaintiff: Precision Industrial Contractors, Inc. and Precision Industrial Contractors Inc
Defendant: Christopher M McClellan, Tami L McClellan, John 1-10 Does, Alpha Omega Industrial, CMC Consulting, LLC, Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R. Gage Refrigeration, Inc., John Does 1-10 and Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05810
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING #16 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; GRANTING #55 MOTION for Order for Immediate Dissolution of TRO filed by Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc, Daniel Jason Hoyt; the parties are responsible for their own fees and costs; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 18, 2019 Attorneys Patricia Kay Buchanan and Adam G Cuff added for Precision Industrial Contractors Inc; per #65 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
October 17, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adam G Cuff on behalf of Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc. (Cuff, Adam)
October 16, 2019 Filing 64 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #37 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Precision Industrial Contractors Inc(a Washington Corporation).(Haberthur, Phillip)
October 16, 2019 Filing 63 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #36 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Precision Industrial Contractors Inc(a Washington Corporation).(Haberthur, Phillip)
October 10, 2019 Filing 62 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Dara Kaleel; Pla Counsel: Phillip Haberthur, James Sikora; Def Counsel: Andrea Richard, Pierre Acebedo; CR: Barry Fanning; Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing held on 10/10/2019. Counsel present argument. Court to issue written ruling within approximately two weeks. (DK)
October 10, 2019 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Christopher McClellan filed by Defendant Christopher M McClellan re #55 MOTION for Order for Immediate Dissolution of TRO (Bradshaw, Sunshine)
October 10, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #55 MOTION for Order for Immediate Dissolution of TRO, by Defendant Christopher M McClellan. (Bradshaw, Sunshine)
October 10, 2019 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Andrea L. Richard filed by Counter Claimants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc, Defendants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc re #55 MOTION for Order for Immediate Dissolution of TRO (Richard, Andrea)
October 10, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Filing Additional Exhibit re #56 Response to Motion,,,,, ; filed by Counter Claimants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc, Defendants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Z, Deposition Excerpts of E. Simensen, Oct. 3, 2019)(Richard, Andrea)
October 8, 2019 RECEIPT of USB Drive re #57 Notice of Filing Paper or Physical Materials: Exhibit U to #56 Response to #2 Motion for TRO and #55 MOTION for Order for Immediate Dissolution of TRO. USB Drive on file in Clerk's Office. (GMR)
October 8, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Filing Video Excerpt of T. Pavelek Deposition, Oct. 3, 2019 in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Counter Claimants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc, Defendants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc. inre #56 Response to Motion,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Key to Exhibits)(Richard, Andrea)
October 8, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE, by Counter Claimants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc, Defendants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc, to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Hoyt Employment Agreement, Aug 2018, #2 Exhibit B, Hoyt Employment Agreement, July 2018, #3 Exhibit C, PIC 2015 Bankruptcy Docket Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D, Emails re PIC's Performance Issues, #5 Exhibit E, Declaration of E. Simensen, #6 Exhibit F, Second Declaration of E. Simensen, #7 Exhibit G, Declaration of T. Pavelek, #8 Exhibit H, Declaration of J. Baldwin, #9 Exhibit I, Declaration of K. Scott, #10 Exhibit J, Declaration of J.R. Gage, #11 Exhibit K, Declaration of D.J. Hoyt, #12 Exhibit L, PIC website: Our Clients, #13 Exhibit M, Resource Recycling, March 5, 2019, #14 Exhibit N, InvestSize, March 7, 2019, #15 Exhibit O, Peninsula Daily News, Sept. 1, 2019, #16 Exhibit P, The Leader, Sept. 20, 2019, #17 Exhibit Q, Construction bidding software Google Search, #18 Exhibit R, PIC's Social Media Post, Aug. 21, 2019, #19 Exhibit S, Depo Exerpts J. Baldwin, Oct. 3, 2019, #20 Exhibit T, Depo Exerpts T. Pavelek, Oct. 3, 2019, #21 Exhibit V, Depo Excerpt of D.J. Hoyt, Oct. 1, 2019, #22 Exhibit W, Depo Excerpt of J.R. Gage, Oct 1, 2019)(Richard, Andrea)
October 8, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Order for Immediate Dissolution of TRO, filed by Counter Claimants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc, Defendants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Immediate Dissolution of TRO) Noting Date 10/7/2019, (Richard, Andrea)
October 7, 2019 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Phillip J. Haberthur filed by Counter Defendant Precision Industrial Contractors Inc re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haberthur, Phillip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 52 Third DECLARATION of Eric Simensen filed by Counter Defendant Precision Industrial Contractors Inc re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Haberthur, Phillip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 51 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #50 Reply to Response to Motion (Haberthur, Phillip)
October 7, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY, filed by Counter Defendant Precision Industrial Contractors Inc, TO RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Haberthur, Phillip)
October 2, 2019 Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER by clerk denying #42 Motion for Default. (DK)
October 1, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by James P Sikora on behalf of Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc. (Sikora, James)
September 30, 2019 ***Motion terminated: #25 MOTION Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrea L. Richards filed by Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc, Daniel Jason Hoyt. (DK)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrea L Richard for defendants Daniel Jason Hoyt and Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc, re #33 Andrea L. Richards ' Application for Pro Hac Vice. The scheduled depositions in this matter should commence without further delay. Entered by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
September 30, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE, by Defendant Christopher M McClellan, to #42 MOTION for Default against Defendant Christopher McClellan. (Bradshaw, Sunshine)
September 30, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sunshine M Bradshaw on behalf of Defendant Tami L McClellan. (Bradshaw, Sunshine)
September 30, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sunshine M Bradshaw on behalf of Defendant Christopher M McClellan. (Bradshaw, Sunshine)
September 27, 2019 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Bradley W. Andersen in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc re #42 MOTION for Default against Defendant Christopher McClellan (Andersen, Bradley)
September 27, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Default against Defendant Christopher McClellan, filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc. Noting Date 9/27/2019, (Andersen, Bradley)
September 27, 2019 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Daniel Jason Hoyt on 9/4/2019, filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc. (Andersen, Bradley)
September 27, 2019 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Tami McClellan on 9/9/2019, filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc. (Andersen, Bradley)
September 27, 2019 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jack R. Gage, Inc. dba Alpha Omega Industrial on 9/4/2019, filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc. (Andersen, Bradley)
September 27, 2019 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Chris McClellan and Tami McClellan on 9/5/2019, filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc. (Andersen, Bradley)
September 26, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 35 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court Revoked Pro Hac Vice Application for Attorney Andrea Richard. Application was processed in error, waiting for direction from the Court. (DS)
September 25, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Hoyt with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc by Daniel Jason Hoyt.(Richard, Andrea)
September 25, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by JRG, dba AOI with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc by Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc.(Richard, Andrea)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #33 Application. The Court ADMITS REVOKED, Pro Hac Vice Application was processed in error. Waiting for direction from the Court. Attorney Andrea L Richard for defendants Daniel Jason Hoyt and Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Modified on 9/26/2019 (DS). Modified on 9/26/2019 (DS). Modified on 9/26/2019 (DS).
September 25, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Pierre E Acebedo on behalf of Defendants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc. (Acebedo, Pierre)
September 25, 2019 Filing 33 APPLICATION Andrea Richard by Defendants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Amended Pro Hac Vice Application)(Acebedo, Pierre) Modified on 9/26/2019 (GMR).
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER on STIPULATION re #31 Stipulation filed by Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc., substituting Attorney Pierre E Acebedo for Defendant Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc; Attorney Daniel J Frohlich terminated; per #31 Stipulation; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
September 23, 2019 Filing 31 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER For Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Jack R. Gage Refrideration by parties (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Frohlich, Daniel)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Seal signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DK)
September 17, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing now set for 10/10/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom B before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DK)
September 17, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Stricken Preliminary Injunction Hrg on 9/19/2019. (DK)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Expedited Discovery, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. The depositions will be conducted prior to 10/4/19. A hearing to review the motion for preliminary injunction will be held on 10/10/19 at 1:30 p.m. The hearing on September 19, 2019 is STRICKEN. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 10/10/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
September 17, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE, by Defendants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc, to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Hoyt, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Scott, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Jack R. Gage, #4 Exhibit Employment Agreement)(Johnson Acebedo, Cindy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrea L. Richards, filed by Defendants Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc. (Acebedo, Pierre)
September 16, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit B to Eric Simensen's Second Declaration by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc re #22 MOTION to Seal , #23 Declaration, (Haberthur, Phillip)
September 16, 2019 Filing 23 Second DECLARATION of Eric Simensen filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #22 MOTION to Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haberthur, Phillip)
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Seal , filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc. Noting Date 9/16/2019, (Haberthur, Phillip)
September 16, 2019 Filing 21 Supplemental BRIEF re 17 Notice of Hearing, 15 Motion Hearing,,, by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc (Haberthur, Phillip)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc, TO RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Andersen, Bradley)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Defendant Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc, to #18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. (Frohlich, Daniel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc. (Andersen, Bradley)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing set for 9/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom B before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DK)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton granting Plaintiff's Moton for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: preliminary Injunction, re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .(DK)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Dara Kaleel; Pla Counsel: Phillip Haberthur; Def Counsel: Thomas Dickson (Andrea Richard via telephone); CR: Debbie Zurn; Motion Hearing held on 9/6/2019 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Precision Industrial Contractors Inc. Argument; Court modifies proposed temporary restraining order and schedules a preliminary injunction hearing. Parties shall submit briefing on the matter by the end of business on 9/16/19. Ms. Richard shall file her Pro Hac Vice application as soon as possible. Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing set for 9/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom B before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE, by Defendant Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc, to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument Requested. (Frohlich, Daniel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel J Frohlich on behalf of Defendant Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc. (Frohlich, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Service filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haberthur, Phillip)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Bradley W Andersen on behalf of Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors Inc. (Andersen, Bradley)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom B before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DK)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/18/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/25/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Daniel Jason Hoyt, Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc (main document), Christopher M McClellan, Tami L McClellan. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Chris and Tami McClellan, #2 Summons - CMC Consulting, #3 Summons - Daniel Hoyt) (ERA)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ERA)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Eric Simensen filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors, Inc. re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Haberthur, Phillip)
August 30, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (ERA)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Travis Pavalek filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors, Inc. re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Haberthur, Phillip)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Jesse Baldwin filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors, Inc. re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Haberthur, Phillip)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Precision Industrial Contractors, Inc.. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/30/2019, (Haberthur, Phillip)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5906126), filed by Precision Industrial Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons Jack R. Gage Refrigeration, Inc., #13 Summons Christopher M. McClellan and Tami L. McClellan, #14 Summons CMC Consulting, LLC, #15 Summons Daniel Jason Hoyt)(Haberthur, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision Industrial Contractors Inc v. Jack R. Gage Refrigeration Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M McClellan
Represented By: Sunshine M Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tami L McClellan
Represented By: Sunshine M Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-10 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Omega Industrial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Jason Hoyt
Represented By: Andrea L Richard
Represented By: Pierre E Acebedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack R. Gage Refrigeration, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack R Gage Refrigeration Inc
Represented By: Andrea L Richard
Represented By: Daniel J Frohlich
Represented By: Thomas L Dickson
Represented By: Pierre E Acebedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Industrial Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley W Andersen
Represented By: Phillip J. Haberthur
Represented By: James P Sikora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Industrial Contractors Inc
Represented By: Bradley W Andersen
Represented By: Phillip J. Haberthur
Represented By: Adam G Cuff
Represented By: Patricia Kay Buchanan
Represented By: James P Sikora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?