Barnhouse v. CR Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Howard Barnhouse
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv05858
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Attorney Natasha A Khachatourians added for C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, per #8 Notice of Attorney Association. (GMR)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Christopher W Tompkins on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Tompkins, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from the District of Arizona (In re: MDL 2:15-md-02641-DGC-PHX) and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR)
September 13, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona, Case Number 2:18-cv-02441. In re: 2:15-md-02641-DGC-PHX. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2019: #5 Certified MDL 15-2641 Docket Sheet, #6 Notice of Filing Submission, #7 Certified Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order) (GMR).
September 12, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Washington via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-2441-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15796742 filed by Howard Barnhouse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnhouse v. CR Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Barnhouse
Represented By: William Rivera Alvarez
Represented By: Christopher Kyle Johnston
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?