Braffith v. CR Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Gene Curtis Braffith
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and CR Bard Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv05865
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James F Rogers for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and for CR Bard Incorporated, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James F. Rogers FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Incorporated (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5929427 (Tompkins, Christopher)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Richard B North, Jr for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Tompkins, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk to pro se plaintiff re receipt of case from the District of Arizona (In re: MDL 2641) and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of Arizona (In re: MDL 2641) and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Christopher W Tompkins on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Tompkins, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona, Case Number 2:16-cv-03642. In re: MDL 2641 - 2:15-md-02641-DGC-PHX. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2019: #2 Certified MDL 15-2641 Docket Sheet, #3 Notice of Filing Submission, #4 Certified Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order) (GMR).
September 13, 2019 Attorney Natasha A Khachatourians added for C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, per #7 Notice of Attorney Association. (GMR)
September 13, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)
September 12, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Washington via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff Counsel's Motion to Withdraw (Doc. 12889). Plaintiff shall be added as pro se and all filings shall go to Plaintiff at 1714 Sequalish Street, Steilacoom, WA 98388. (MDL 2641 - Doc. 13567) (GMR)
October 20, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-3642-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
October 20, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13524684 filed by Gene Curtis Braffith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braffith v. CR Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: James F Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: James F Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Curtis Braffith
Represented By: Brian Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?