Cashatt et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Beth Joswick, David Hodel, Chad Prentice, Jeffrey Heath, Brandon Kendall and Randall Cashatt
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv05886
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, TO RESPONSE to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Todaro, Anthony)
October 27, 2019 Filing 18 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ., filed by Plaintiffs Randall Cashatt, Jeffrey Heath, David Hodel, Beth Joswick, Brandon Kendall, Chad Prentice. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/1/2019, (Townsend, Josephine)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Continue re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: New Noting Date 11/1/2019; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Continue 12b6 hearing, filed by Plaintiffs Randall Cashatt, Jeffrey Heath, David Hodel, Beth Joswick, Brandon Kendall, Chad Prentice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/2/2019, (Townsend, Josephine)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/31/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/17/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/24/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings. Hon. Michelle L. Peterson no longer assigned to case. (TF)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ford Motor Company (Todaro, Anthony)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Todaro, Anthony)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #8 Notice to Filer ; filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Todaro, Anthony)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Randall Cashatt, Jeffrey Heath, David Hodel, Beth Joswick, Brandon Kendall, Chad Prentice (Townsend, Josephine)
September 26, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Ford Motor Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/3/2019. (ERA)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ERA)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/18/2019, (Todaro, Anthony)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, SUPPLEMENTAL by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Todaro, Anthony)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/30/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA)
September 23, 2019 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (ERA)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Todaro, Anthony)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Christopher Eikey re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Todaro, Anthony)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 19-2-02452-06; (Receipt # 0981-5934537), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Todaro, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cashatt et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Joswick
Represented By: Josephine C Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hodel
Represented By: Josephine C Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Prentice
Represented By: Josephine C Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Heath
Represented By: Josephine C Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Kendall
Represented By: Josephine C Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Cashatt
Represented By: Josephine C Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?