Abbott et al v. US Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Ann Abbott and Wade Monty Abbott
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A., Transition Title, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Transnation Title, Specialized Loan Servicing, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc and US Bank NA
Case Number: 3:2019cv05941
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/26/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald B. Leighton no longer assigned to case. (ERA)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Transnation Title, US Bank NA. (ERA)
October 4, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (ERA)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Transition Title, US Bank NA, filed by Wade Monty Abbott, Deborah Ann Abbott. (Receipt # 0981-5952187) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Chalmers)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott et al v. US Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transition Title
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transnation Title
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ann Abbott
Represented By: Chalmers C Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Monty Abbott
Represented By: Chalmers C Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?