Emrit v. Universal Music Group et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Island Def Jam Group, Universal Music Group, Rick Ross and Shakir Stewart
Case Number: 3:2019cv05984
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re #6 Order on Report and Recommendation, #7 Judgment by Court by Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit. Filing Fee Not Paid/Received- IFP Denied. (cc: USCA) (GMR)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT of CD Welcome to Atlantis submitted as Extrinsic Evidence of Copyright ownership of the song "Dilemma" filed filed via Amazon, by Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit. (NOTE: CD received) (GMR)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT BY COURT. (GMR- cc: pltf)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Plaintiff's #1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED and this case is DISMISSED as duplicative. (GMR- cc: pltf)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS and USM-285 form, filed by Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit. (NOTE: not issued) (Attachments: #1 USM-285, #2 envelope)(GMR)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Proposed Complaint, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. Noting Date: 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment)(GMR- cc: pltf)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (GMR)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Christel, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Universal Music Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Def Jam Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shakir Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?