Luff v. Albertsons LLC
Plaintiff: Brooke Luff
Defendant: Albertson's LLC and Albertsons LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv06019
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/30/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/16/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/23/2020, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, William M McCool. (KEB)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/4/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA)
October 28, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (ERA)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Albertson's Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate AB Acquisition LLC for Albertson's LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Albertson's LLC (Umlauf, Roy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Albertson's LLC (Umlauf, Roy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #3 Notice-Other, #2 Declaration (non motion), #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Albertson's LLC (Umlauf, Roy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal re #2 Declaration (non motion), #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Albertson's LLC. (Umlauf, Roy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Roy A. Umlauf in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Action re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Albertson's LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Umlauf, Roy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 19-2-11044-4; (Receipt # 0981-5982968), filed by Albertson's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Umlauf, Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luff v. Albertsons LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertson's LLC
Represented By: Roy Andrew Umlauf
Represented By: Alexandra E Ormsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons LLC
Represented By: Roy Andrew Umlauf
Represented By: Alexandra E Ormsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Luff
Represented By: Daniel McLafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?