Norton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Edward Norton
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv06020
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas Michael Elsberry on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Elsberry, Thomas)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on on 11/20/2019, filed by Plaintiff Edward Norton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gilbrough, Amy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to Defendant, Commissioner of Social Security. (KAM)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Defendant Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Edward Norton. (Summons(es) as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) (Receipt # None - IFP Granted) (KAM)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Edward Norton.(Gilbrough, Amy)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER NOT TO PROVIDE COURTESY COPIES OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD: The Administration should not file a paper or CD courtesy copy of the Administrative Record for chambers in this matter. This does not modify the procedure for any other chambers. Signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
October 31, 2019 IFP Application Refiling re 3 Minute Order; Due Date 11/14/2019. (KAM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER #1 RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's Motion re: Doc #1 is not legible and is therefore stricken from the docket. Plaintiff should file a legible version of the In Forma Pauperis Application if he wishes to have his Application considered by the Court. Filer has until 11/14/2019 to correct this deficiency. (KAM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT filed by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KAM)
October 30, 2019 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SP)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 *MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Edward Norton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons)(Gilbrough, Amy) Modified on 10/31/2019 *IFP Application stricken as it is not legible. Plaintiff to resubmit by 11/14/2019 per Minute Order Doc 3 (KAM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Norton
Represented By: Amy Gilbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Thomas Michael Elsberry
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?