Berryhill v. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gregory Wayne Berryhill
Defendant: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv06028
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), and the parties' re #9 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. (TF)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice - FRCP 41(a) by parties (Lether, Thomas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas)
November 6, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/13/2019. (ERA)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/27/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/11/2019, by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle and referred to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (TF)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/7/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA)
October 31, 2019 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (ERA)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Eric Neal re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Neal, Eric)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number Unknown; (Receipt # 0981-5988971), filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B Complaint, #4 Exhibit C)(Neal, Eric) Modified on 11/6/2019 (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berryhill v. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Wayne Berryhill
Represented By: Shane M. Moriarty
Represented By: Douglas T Weinmaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?