Smith v. Stevens Transport et al
Plaintiff: Craig Smith
Defendant: John Doe, Stevens Transport CD, Inc., Stevens Transport T L, Inc, Fabiola Estrada, Stevens Transport, Stevens Transport TL Inc, John Doe Estrada and Stevens Transport CD Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv06038
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Paul Joseph Landry for Plaintiff Craig Smith from 12/22/2019-01/03/2020. (Landry, Paul)
December 23, 2019 REFERRING JSR due (motion calendar tracking event only) to: Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 23, 2019 JSR due 1/31/2020. (JL)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/17/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/24/2020, Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2020. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan and referred to Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke for all further proceedings. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M McCool. (TW)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 12/26/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER modifying the list of parties in accordance with the operative complaint (Dkt. [1-1]). By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint; Defendants Stevens Transport, Inc.'s and Fabiola Estrada's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages by Fabiola Estrada, Stevens Transport.(Vandor, Brendan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA)
November 4, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (ERA)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Fabiola Estrada, Stevens Transport (Vandor, Brendan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Stevens Transport (Vandor, Brendan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Brendan Vandor In Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Fabiola Estrada, Stevens Transport (Vandor, Brendan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 19-2-11056-8; (Receipt # 0981-5992906), filed by Stevens Transport, Fabiola Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vandor, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Stevens Transport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens Transport CD, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens Transport T L, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabiola Estrada
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Vandor
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens Transport
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Vandor
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens Transport TL Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens Transport CD Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Smith
Represented By: Paul Joseph Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?