Bussey v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Bussey
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC, Cook Incorporated, William Cook Europe, APS, Cook Medical LLC and William Cook Europe APS
Case Number: 3:2019cv06062
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSFERRED CASE opened in the Southern District of Indiana as case 1:19-cv-06105 on 12/23/2019. (PM)
December 23, 2019 Case sent to the Southern District of Indiana by electronic case. (PM)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 MDL 2570 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -70); In re Cook Medical, Inc., IVC Filters Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation; Southern District of Indiana; assigned to Judge Ricahrd L. Young under case no. 1:19-cv-6105-RLY-TAB. (PM)
November 13, 2019 JSR due 2/11/2020. (JL)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/28/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/4/2020, Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2020. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, William Cook Europe APS (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GMR)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #5 Notice to Filer by Plaintiff Andrew Bussey (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Yackulic, Corrie)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint - Summonses are incomplete. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GMR)
November 13, 2019 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (GMR)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jessica Glitz for Andrew Bussey, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jessica Glitz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Andrew Bussey (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6003261 (Yackulic, Corrie)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Southern District of Indiana, case number in other court 1:14-ml-2570-RLY-TAB ; filed by Plaintiff Andrew Bussey. (Yackulic, Corrie)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, William Cook Europe APS with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6003251), filed by Andrew Bussey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Yackulic, Corrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bussey v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Bussey
Represented By: Jessica Glitz
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cook Europe, APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cook Europe APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?