Sarchami v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Golnaz Sarchami
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION dba AMTRAK and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv06066
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Wackerbarth, Tim)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Wackerbarth, Tim)
November 21, 2019 Attorney Andrew Gordon Yates, Warren E. Babb, Jr, and Katie Bass for National Railroad Passenger Corporation added per #7 Notice of Appearance. (ERA)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tim D. Wackerbarth on behalf of Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Golnaz Sarchami (Murphy, Jason)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/3/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER re #1 Complaint: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ERA)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (ERA)
November 12, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ERA)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Golnaz Sarchami (Murphy, Jason)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6004623) Attorney Jason M Murphy added to party Golnaz Sarchami(pty:pla), filed by Golnaz Sarchami. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarchami v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION dba AMTRAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golnaz Sarchami
Represented By: Jason M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?