Leonard et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Hannah M Leonard, Cody A Clark and Emema Tulafono-Levaula
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION dba AMTRAK and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv06099
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John A Bonventre for National Railroad Passenger Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mark S Landman for National Railroad Passenger Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John A. Bonventre FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6050630 (Wackerbarth, Tim)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark S. Landman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6050604 (Wackerbarth, Tim)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 3/12/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/27/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/5/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Yates, Andrew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Wackerbarth, Tim)
November 19, 2019 PLEASE DISREGARD, DOCKETED IN ERROR. NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, National Railroad Passenger Corporation must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/26/2019. (ERA) Modified on 11/19/2019 (ERA).
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA)
November 19, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ERA)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiffs of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Andrew G. Yates re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wackerbarth, Tim)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number N/A; (Receipt # 0981-6014704), filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Related Cases, #2 Exhibit A Complaint)(Wackerbarth, Tim) Modified on 11/20/2019 (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION dba AMTRAK
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Represented By: Mark S Landman
Represented By: John A Bonventre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah M Leonard
Represented By: Christopher Michael Davis
Represented By: Maridith E. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody A Clark
Represented By: Christopher Michael Davis
Represented By: Maridith E. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emema Tulafono-Levaula
Represented By: Christopher Michael Davis
Represented By: Maridith E. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?