Joyce v. Pierce County et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Brent Lee Heath, deceased and Marie Joyce
Defendant: Jane Doe Shanks, Pierce County and Carl Shanks
Case Number: 3:2019cv06119
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks.(Helmberger, Peter)
December 11, 2019 REFERRING JSR due (motion calendar tracking event) to: Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 11, 2019 JSR due 2/20/2020. (JL)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/6/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/13/2020, Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2020. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan and referred to Magistrate Judge David W. Christel for all further proceedings, by Clerk, William M McCool. (KEB)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 12/13/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Pierce County on 11/26/2019, filed by Plaintiff Marie Joyce. (Otto, Anthony)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Peter J Helmberger on behalf of Defendants Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks. (Helmberger, Peter)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Frank Cornelius on behalf of Defendants Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks. (Cornelius, Frank)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jane Doe Shanks mailed on 11/27/2019 (Cornelius, Frank)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Carl Shanks mailed on 11/27/2019 (Cornelius, Frank)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corrected Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Pierce County) (ERA)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Marie Joyce (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Otto, Anthony)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ERA)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 ISSUED IN ERROR, SUMMONS FORM INCOMPLETE, PLEASE RE-FILE COMPLETED DOCUMENT TO HAVE CORRECTED SUMMONS ISSUED Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Pierce County) (ERA) Modified on 11/25/2019 (ERA).
November 22, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (ERA)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-6022792) Attorney Anthony Clarence Otto added to party Marie Joyce(pty:pla), filed by Estate of Brent Lee Heath, deceased, Marie Joyce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Otto, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joyce v. Pierce County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Shanks
Represented By: Frank Cornelius
Represented By: Peter J Helmberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County
Represented By: Frank Cornelius
Represented By: Peter J Helmberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Shanks
Represented By: Frank Cornelius
Represented By: Peter J Helmberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Brent Lee Heath, deceased
Represented By: Anthony Clarence Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Joyce
Represented By: Anthony Clarence Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?