State of Washington Health Care Authority v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: State of Washington Health Care Authority
Defendant: Providence St Peter Hospital, Kadlec Regional Medical Center, Providence Mount Carmel Hospital, Providence Regional Medical Center Everett, Swedish Medical Center First Hill/Ballard, Seema Verma, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Swedish Medical Center Edmonds, Swedish Medical Center Issaquah, Providence Centralia Hospital, Providence Holy Family Hospital, Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center, Swedish Medical Center Cherry Hill, Providence St Mary Medical Center, Snohomish County Public Hospital District No 1, Alex M Azar, II, Seattle Children's Hospital and King County Public Hospital District No 2
Case Number: 3:2019cv06137
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Madden on behalf of Defendants Kadlec Regional Medical Center, King County Public Hospital District No 2, Providence Centralia Hospital, Providence Holy Family Hospital, Providence Mount Carmel Hospital, Providence Regional Medical Center Everett, Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center, Providence St Mary Medical Center, Providence St Peter Hospital, Seattle Children's Hospital, Snohomish County Public Hospital District No 1, Swedish Medical Center Cherry Hill, Swedish Medical Center Edmonds, Swedish Medical Center First Hill/Ballard, Swedish Medical Center Issaquah. (Madden, Michael) Modified on 1/6/2020 striking Seattle Children's Hospital, selected by mistake (JF).
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Swedish Medical Center Issaquah mailed on 12/3/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Swedish Medical Center First Hill/Ballard mailed on 12/23/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Swedish Medical Center Edmonds mailed on 12/3/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Swedish Medical Center Cherry Hill mailed on 12/3/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Snohomish County Public Hospital District No 1 mailed on 12/3/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Providence St Peter Hospital mailed on 12/3/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Providence St Mary Medical Center mailed on 12/3/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center mailed on 12/3/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Providence Regional Medical Center Everett mailed on 12/3/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Providence Mount Carmel Hospital mailed on 12/3/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Providence Holy Family Hospital mailed on 12/3/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Providence Centralia Hospital mailed on 12/3/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant King County Public Hospital District No 2 mailed on 12/3/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Kadlec Regional Medical Center mailed on 12/3/2019 (Stephens, William)
December 11, 2019 Attorney Ross Siler for Seattle Children's Hospital added per #4 Notice of Appearance. (ERA)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Renee M. Howard on behalf of Defendant Seattle Children's Hospital. (Howard, Renee)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant All Plaintiffs (Stephens, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Alex M Azar, II (main document), Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Seema Verma. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Verma, #2 Summons - CMS) (ERA)
November 26, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (ERA)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-6027098) Attorney William T Stephens added to party State of Washington Health Care Authority(pty:pla), filed by State of Washington Health Care Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Azar, #3 Summons CMS, #4 Summons Verma)(Stephens, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington Health Care Authority v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington Health Care Authority
Represented By: William T Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence St Peter Hospital
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kadlec Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Mount Carmel Hospital
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Regional Medical Center Everett
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swedish Medical Center First Hill/Ballard
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swedish Medical Center Edmonds
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swedish Medical Center Issaquah
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Centralia Hospital
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Holy Family Hospital
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swedish Medical Center Cherry Hill
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence St Mary Medical Center
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County Public Hospital District No 1
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Children's Hospital
Represented By: Ross Siler
Represented By: Renee M. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Public Hospital District No 2
Represented By: Michael Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?