KS TACOMA HOTEL, LLC v. TERRY CARE GROUP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: KS TACOMA HOTEL, LLC
Defendant: COLUMBIA PACIFIC ADVISORS, LLC, TERRY CARE GROUP, LLC and LEISURE CARE, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv06161
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/20/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/27/2020, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Columbia Pacific Advisors LLC, Leisure Care LLC, and Terry Care Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SP)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (SP)
December 5, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (SP)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Chia Ju Hung for KS TACOMA HOTEL, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). **Per PHV application local counsel maintains an office in the WDWA**(CDA)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Chia Ju Hung FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff KS TACOMA HOTEL, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6034552 (Pitchford, Susan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Provenance Hotel Partners Fund I, LLC for KS TACOMA HOTEL, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by KS TACOMA HOTEL, LLC (Pitchford, Susan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff KS TACOMA HOTEL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Leisure Care, LLC, #2 Summons Columbia Pacific Advisors, LLC)(Pitchford, Susan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff KS TACOMA HOTEL, LLC. (Pitchford, Susan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6034408), filed by KS TACOMA HOTEL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Pitchford, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KS TACOMA HOTEL, LLC v. TERRY CARE GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBIA PACIFIC ADVISORS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY CARE GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEISURE CARE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KS TACOMA HOTEL, LLC
Represented By: Chia Ju Hung
Represented By: Susan D Pitchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?