Multifab Inc v. Zweiger et al
Plaintiff: Multifab Inc
Defendant: William Sturgill, PEI Manufacturing LLC and Jon Zweiger
Case Number: 3:2019cv06164
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Timothy B. Smith in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss [DKT 31] filed by Plaintiff Multifab Inc re #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Gregg)
January 31, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Multifab Inc, to #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Smith, Gregg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Jon Zweiger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/14/2020, (Graham, Lawrence)
January 20, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Multifab Inc re #4 MOTION to Seal, #26 Order on Motion to Seal, Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Smith, Gregg)
January 13, 2020 Filing 28 REQUEST by Plaintiff Multifab Inc for Return of Moot Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Supporting Documents Pursuant to LCR 5(g)(6) re 9 Ex Parte-Sealed Document, 8 Ex Parte-Sealed Document (Smith, Gregg)
January 13, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) PEI Manufacturing LLC and William Sturgill (Individually, and as Governor of Defendant PEI Manufacturing, LLC), filed by Plaintiff Multifab Inc. (Smith, Gregg)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Renoting Plaintiff's #4 MOTION to Seal. Noting Date = 1/31/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 16, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Seal re #4 MOTION to Seal ; filed by Defendants PEI Manufacturing LLC, William Sturgill. (Rogers, Ian)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 3/12/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/27/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/5/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #21 Stipulation to withdraw #2 motion filed by Jon Zweiger. Defendant Jon Zweiger answer is due 1/24/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Stricken Temporary Restraining Order Hearing on 12/11/2019, per #21 Stipulation. (MGC)
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to withdraw motion by parties re #2 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Graham, Lawrence)
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lawrence D Graham on behalf of Defendant Jon Zweiger. (Graham, Lawrence)
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) PEI Manufacturing LLC, William Sturgill, Jon Zweiger (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GMR)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Multifab Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons Zweiger, #2 Summons Sturgill - 1, #3 Summons Sturgill - 2, #4 Summons PEI)(Smith, Gregg)
December 9, 2019 Reset Deadline per #17 Order: PEI Manufacturing LLC answer due 1/24/2020; William Sturgill answer due 1/24/2020. (MGC)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Stipulation to Withdraw Motion filed by PEI Manufacturing LLC, William Sturgill. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 6, 2019 Attorney David A. Perez for PEI Manufacturing LLC,David A. Perez for William Sturgill added; per #13 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
December 6, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Withdraw Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Extend Answer Deadline by parties re #1 Complaint, #2 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Perez, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Multifab Inc re #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 MOTION to Seal, #10 Notice-Other, #1 Complaint, #2 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #3 Declaration, (Smith, Gregg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose re #2 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Defendants PEI Manufacturing LLC, William Sturgill. (Rogers, Ian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ian Rogers on behalf of Defendants PEI Manufacturing LLC, William Sturgill. (Rogers, Ian)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Multifab Inc re #11 Order Setting Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Smith, Gregg)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Hearing on #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: TRO Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LITIGATION HOLD AND SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE ; filed by Plaintiff Multifab Inc. (Smith, Gregg)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER re #2 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Multifab, Inc: Plaintiff is directed to comply with Local Rules W.D. Wash. LCR 5(g) and provisionally file unredacted copies of the complaint and motion for temporary restraining order under seal. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Multifab Inc (Smith, Gregg)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal filed by Plaintiff Multifab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal) Noting Date 12/20/2019, (Smith, Gregg) Modified on 12/5/2019 to remove docket and document restrictions and correct motion event (GMR).
December 4, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ERA)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Redacted DECLARATION of Timothy B. Smith filed by Plaintiff Multifab, Inc. re #2 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Smith, Gregg) Modified on 12/5/2019 to remove duplicate text only (GMR).
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Multifab, Inc.. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for TRO) Noting Date 12/4/2019, (Smith, Gregg)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 REDACTED COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) FOR MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE SECRETS against defendant(s) PEI Manufacturing, LLC, William Sturgill, Jon Zweiger with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6036678), filed by Multifab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Gregg) Modified on 12/5/2019 (GMR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Multifab Inc v. Zweiger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Multifab Inc
Represented By: Gregg R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sturgill
Represented By: David A. Perez
Represented By: Ian Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEI Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: David A. Perez
Represented By: Ian Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Zweiger
Represented By: Lawrence D Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?