Allen et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mykayla Allen and Tairaya Allen
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION dba AMTRAK, National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Does One Through Fifty
Case Number: 3:2019cv06180
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Wackerbarth, Tim)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Wackerbarth, Tim)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 3/16/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/2/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/9/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin C Brague on behalf of Plaintiffs Mykayla Allen, Tairaya Allen. (Brague, Kevin)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tim D. Wackerbarth on behalf of Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SP)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (SP)
December 11, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6041763) Attorney Paul Simon Bovarnick added to party Mykayla Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Simon Bovarnick added to party Tairaya Allen(pty:pla), filed by Tairaya Allen, Mykayla Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bovarnick, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION dba AMTRAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does One Through Fifty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mykayla Allen
Represented By: Paul Simon Bovarnick
Represented By: Kevin C Brague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tairaya Allen
Represented By: Paul Simon Bovarnick
Represented By: Kevin C Brague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?