Berntsen v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: EDWARD M BERNTSEN
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv06218
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Wackerbarth, Tim)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Wackerbarth, Tim)
January 14, 2020 Attorny Andrew Gordon Yates and Warren E. Babb, Jr for National Railroad Passenger Corporation added per #5 Notice of Appearance. (ERA)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tim D. Wackerbarth on behalf of Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (SP)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Edward M Berntsen (Graves, Daryl)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 3/23/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/9/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/16/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 19, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ERA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6057206), filed by Edward M Berntsen. (Attachments: #1 Coversheet)(Graves, Daryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berntsen v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD M BERNTSEN
Represented By: Daryl L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?