Farnsworth v. Armstrong et al
Plaintiff: Charles V Farnsworth
Defendant: Five Unknown Health Care Providers, Bruce C Gage, Jackie Brennan, Teddi Armstrong and Washington State Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2020cv05007
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Teddi Armstrong, Jackie Brennan, Five Unknown Health Care Providers, Bruce C Gage, Washington State Department of Corrections with JURY DEMAND, filed by Charles V Farnsworth. (Receipt # IFP Granted) **20 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Charles Farnsworth, Prisoner ID: 875475) (ERA)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Charles Farnsworth, Prisoner ID: 875475) (ERA)
February 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ADDENDUM to Civil Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Charles V Farnsworth. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Charles Farnsworth, Prisoner ID: 875475) (ERA)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Charles V Farnsworth. (Attachments: #1 Signed Acknowledgment and Authorization form) **10 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Charles Farnsworth, Prisoner ID: 875475) (ERA)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Signed Acknowledgment and Authorization form, filed by Charles Farnsworth. **3 PAGE(S) received via US Mail, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Charles Farnsworth, Prisoner ID: 875475) (ERA)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER: re #4 Signed Acknowledgment and Authorization form RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Clallam Bay Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Charles Farnsworth, Prisoner ID: 875475) (ERA)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER sent to Plaintiff re case number, judge assignment and IFP deficiency: - Enclosed please find your Acknowledgment and Authorization form to be signed and returned to Court. Filer has until 2/10/2020 to correct. (Attachments: #1 Authorization and Acknowledgment form) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Charles Farnsworth, Prisoner ID: 875475)(GMR)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Acknowledgement and Authorization unsigned), filed by Plaintiff Charles V Farnsworth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)**44 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Charles Farnsworth, Prisoner ID: 875475)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farnsworth v. Armstrong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Unknown Health Care Providers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce C Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teddi Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles V Farnsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?