Lexington Insurance Company et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Enduris, Lexington Insurance Company and Port of Grays Harbor
Defendant: MAB 6 UK, United States, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Department of the Army and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv05038
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States Department of the Army on 2/3/2020, filed by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company. (Siddiki, Adil)
March 3, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States Army Corps of Engineers on 2/3/2020, filed by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company. (Siddiki, Adil)
March 3, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States of America on 2/3/2020, filed by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company. (Siddiki, Adil)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/18/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/26/2020, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 3/5/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matt Waldrop on behalf of Defendants United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Waldrop, Matt)
January 28, 2020 Filing 9 PRAECIPE to attach document re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Siddiki, Adil)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Zachary P Marks for Enduris, Lexington Insurance Company and Port of Grays Harbor, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paul B Hines for Enduris,Lexington Insurance Company and Port of Grays Harbor, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Zachary P. Marks FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company, Port of Grays Harbor and Enduris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6095521 (Siddiki, Adil) Modified on 1/22/2020 added additional plaintiffs names (CDA).
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paul B. Hines FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs, Lexington Insurance Company, Port of Grays Harbor and Enduris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6095443 (Siddiki, Adil) Modified on 1/22/2020 add additional plaintiffs names (CDA).
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating Corporate Parent American International Group Inc for Lexington Insurance Company. no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Lexington Insurance Company (Siddiki, Adil) Modified on 1/23/2020 to correct corporate parent information (ERA).
January 17, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiffs Lexington & Enduris must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/24/2020. (MET)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) MAB 6 UK, United States (main document), United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Department of the Army. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (ERA)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ERA) Modified on 1/16/2020, sent in error (ERA).
January 16, 2020 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (ERA)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Money Damages Under the Federal Tort Claims Act against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Attorney Adil Aziz Siddiki added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Receipt # TAC016026) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Siddiki, Adil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexington Insurance Company et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAB 6 UK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Army
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enduris
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Represented By: Zachary P Marks
Represented By: Paul B Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Represented By: Zachary P Marks
Represented By: Paul B Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Port of Grays Harbor
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Represented By: Zachary P Marks
Represented By: Paul B Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?