Thomas v. Northwest Immigration Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Ashton Wallace Rodger Thomas
Defendant: Neil Clark, GEO, Northwest Immigration Detention Center and Kevin Wilks
Case Number: 3:2020cv05039
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Neil Clark, GEO, Northwest Immigration Detention Center, Kevin Wilks, filed by Ashton Wallace Rodger Thomas.(IFP Granted) (ERA)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (ERA - cc: plaintiff)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 2/18/2020 to correct. (ERA - cc: plaintiff with forms)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Ashton W Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint) (ERA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Northwest Immigration Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Immigration Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wilks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashton Wallace Rodger Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?