Graham v. Safeway Inc et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Graham
Defendant: Total Cleaning Solutions, Inc., Safeway Inc and Total Cleaning Solutions Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv05206
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting re #9 Stipulated MOTION to withdraw and substitute counsel signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DK)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Total Cleaning Solutions Inc (Khachatourians, Natasha)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint; of Safeway Inc and Total Cleaning Solutions, Inc with JURY DEMAND Attorney Natasha A Khachatourians added to party Safeway Inc(pty:dft) by Safeway Inc, Total Cleaning Solutions Inc.(Khachatourians, Natasha)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION to withdraw and substitute counsel, filed by Defendant Safeway Inc. Noting Date 4/8/2020, (Khachatourians, Natasha)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/1/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/8/2020, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 3/16/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (KB)
March 9, 2020 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (KB)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Safeway Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state court file)(Kugler, John)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent AB Acquisition LLC for Safeway Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Safeway Inc (Kugler, John)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 20-2-04253-1; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6193408), filed by Safeway Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kugler, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Safeway Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Cleaning Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc
Represented By: John Turner Kugler
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Cleaning Solutions Inc
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Graham
Represented By: Jeffrey Sadler
Represented By: John L Messina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?