Conrad v. CR Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: William Conrad
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and CR Bard Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv05215
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 29 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of Oregon and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR)
March 10, 2020 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Oregon, Case Number 3:19-cv-01702.
March 10, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and CR Bard Incorporated must file Corporate Disclosure Statements by 3/17/2020. (GMR)
March 10, 2020 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF TRANSFER: The Parties' Joint Motion to Change or Transfer Venue [ECF 26] is GRANTED. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404, this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. Signed on 3/6/2020 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 26 Joint Motion to Change or Transfer Venue . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Daly, Taylor) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Telephone Status Conference held. As stated on the record, Parties to file joint motion for change of venue. Colette McEldowney present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Taylor Daly, Nancy Erfle, Shaniqua Singleton present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (kms) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Telephone Rule 16 Conference is set for 2/28/2020 at 01:30PM in Portland before Judge Michael W. Mosman. The parties are to call the conference line. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #21 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory D. Rueb. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6275517 #21 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (sss) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: Original filed on outdated form. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory D. Rueb. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6275517. Filed by William Conrad. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (McEldowney, Colette) (Main Document 21 replaced on 2/19/2020) (cw). [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance of Colette Jeanine McEldowney appearing on behalf of William Conrad Filed by on behalf of William Conrad. (McEldowney, Colette) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 19 Joint Status Report . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Erfle, Nancy) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 18 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to John A Dalimonte and Paul Lincoln Stoller regarding Scheduling, 17 . (kms) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Joint Rule 26(f) report is due by 1/31/2020. Furthermore, non-admitted counsel for Plaintiff must seek admission to practice, pursuant to the instructions in this courts Notice to Non-Admitted Counsel 11 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brandee J. Kowalzyk for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6091304 issued. Signed on 11/21/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Taylor T. Daly for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6091293 issued. Signed on 11/21/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brandee J. Kowalzyk . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6091304. Filed by All Defendants. (Erfle, Nancy) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Taylor T. Daly . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6091293. Filed by All Defendants. (Erfle, Nancy) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Nancy M. Erfle is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Richard B. North, Jr Filed by All Defendants. (Erfle, Nancy) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the District of Arizona. Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. Related Document: Case Transferred In - District Transfer #10 . (eo) [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01180. Electronic file received. [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to the District of Oregon via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Amended Complaint filed by William Conrad, #6 Amended Complaint filed by William Conrad. Document entered in wrong case. ALL DOCUMENTS MUST BE FILED IN THE LEAD CASE. DO NOT FILE ANY DOCUMENTS IN THIS MEMBER CASE. Additionally, filing an amended complaint is a TWO STEP process. Please review Rule 15.1 and file the 15.1 Notice (with the attached red-line version) and then file separately the Amended Complaint. If you are continuing to have issues with this process please call Customer Service. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile documents in correct case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by William Conrad.(Dalimonte, John) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by William Conrad. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Dalimonte, John) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by William Conrad. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44, #2 Supplement Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Supplement Notice of Lawsuit, #4 Summons Waiver of Service of Summons)(Dalimonte, John) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Amended Complaint filed by William Conrad. Document entered in wrong case. All documents must be filed in the lead case. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. Filing an Amended Complaint is a TWO STEP PROCESS. It requires the filing of a Notice (with the required attachment) AND the Amended Complaint using separate events. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile documents in correct case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. You must also file the Amended Complaint in the lead case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated filed by William Conrad. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44, #2 Supplement Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Supplement Notice of Lawsuit, #4 Summons Waiver of Service of Summons)(Dalimonte, John) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-01180-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16559601 filed by William Conrad. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] [Transferred from ord on 3/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conrad v. CR Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Represented By: Nancy M Erfle
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Taylor Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Incorporated
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Taylor Daly
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Represented By: Nancy M Erfle
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Conrad
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: John A Dalimonte
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Represented By: Colette Jeanine McEldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?