Ciaciuch v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ciaciuch
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv05403
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kimberly Ciaciuch.(Crawford, Melton)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on STIPULATION re #11 GRANTING the Filing of a Second Amended Complaint; counsel is directed to e-file the Amended Complaint; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.PRO. 15(a)(2) REGARDING DEFENDANTS CONSENT TO PLAINTIFF FILING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by parties (Crawford, Melton)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Kimberly Ciaciuch.(Crawford, Melton)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint; by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.(Swale, Sarah)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/3/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/20/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/27/2020, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clallam County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR)
May 4, 2020 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, AND NOTICE OF STATE COURT CASE NUMBER 20-2-00251-05 by Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, Civil Case Sheet, and Conformed Copies of State Court Records)(Swale, Sarah)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company for United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company (Swale, Sarah)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION OF SARAH E. SWALE IN SUPPORT OF REMOVAL re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Documents, #2 Exhibit Nebraska SOS Registration Data)(Swale, Sarah)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Swale, Sarah)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clallam County Superior Court, case number NA - Served but not Filed (20-2-00251-05); (Receipt # AWAWDC-6304766), filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Swale, Sarah) Modified on 5/4/2020 (GMR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ciaciuch v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ciaciuch
Represented By: Melton L Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Represented By: Sarah E Swale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?