Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation USA v. Markley Enterprises Inc et al
Plaintiff: Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A. and Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation USA
Defendant: James P. Markley, Markley Enterprises, Inc., Northwest Yamaha Golf Car Sales, Markley Enterprises Inc and James P Markley
Case Number: 3:2020cv05407
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Markley Enterprises, Inc. DBA Northwest Yamaha Golf Car Sales on 5/8/2020, filed by Plaintiff Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation USA. (Morgan, Stuart)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on James P. Markley on 5/8/2020, filed by Plaintiff Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation USA. (Morgan, Stuart)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) James P Markley (GMR)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) James P Markley, Markley Enterprises Inc. (ERA) Modified on 5/7/2020 (GMR).
May 4, 2020 Judge David W. Christel added. (ERA)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A. (Morgan, Stuart)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, etc. against defendant(s) Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A. Markley Enterprises Inc, James P Markley (Receipt # AWAWDC-6305792), filed by Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)(Morgan, Stuart) Modified on 5/5/2020 to correct party as to whom complaint is filed (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation USA v. Markley Enterprises Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A.
Represented By: Stuart Charles Morgan
Represented By: Grady Ryan Heins
Represented By: Leland Clay Selby, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation USA
Represented By: Stuart Charles Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Markley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markley Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Yamaha Golf Car Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markley Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P Markley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?