Elkharwily v. Kaiser Permanente et al
Plaintiff: Alaa Elkharwily
Defendant: Tony Haftel, Bennett Bigelow, Franciscan Health System, Erin Seeberger, Group Health System, Dennis DeLeon, David Dempster, Kaiser Permanente, Kim Nighswager, Bruce Megard, William Cammarano, John and Mary Doe I-X and Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS
Case Number: 3:2020cv05505
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 53 RESPONSE, by Defendant Group Health System, to #26 MOTION to Remand to Pierce County State Court. (Moniz, Donna)
July 20, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #48 Response to Motion, by Defendants David Dempster, Group Health System. (Sherwood, Skylar)
July 20, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #48 Response to Motion, by Defendants William Cammarano, Dennis DeLeon, Franciscan Health System, Tony Haftel, Kim Nighswager. (Thorsvig, Amanda)
July 20, 2020 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Kimberly Wolf filed by Defendants Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS, Bruce Megard, Erin Seeberger re #26 MOTION to Remand to Pierce County State Court (Petrak, Keith)
July 20, 2020 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Keith D. Petrak filed by Defendants Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS, Bruce Megard, Erin Seeberger re #26 MOTION to Remand to Pierce County State Court (Petrak, Keith)
July 20, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE, by Defendants Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS, Bruce Megard, Erin Seeberger, to #26 MOTION to Remand to Pierce County State Court. Oral Argument Requested. (Petrak, Keith)
July 20, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Joinder in Removal re #6 Notice-Other, ; filed by Defendant Group Health System. (Moniz, Donna)
July 17, 2020 Filing 46 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Alaa Elkharwily, TO RESPONSE to #34 MOTION Strike Defendants' filings And to purge false records And to invalidate the proceeding in this court (Elkharwily, Alaa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Alaa Elkharwily, TO RESPONSE to #34 MOTION Strike Defendants' filings And to purge false records And to invalidate the proceeding in this court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Elkharwily Affidavit with Exhibits for Reply)(Elkharwily, Alaa)
July 13, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #41 Response to Motion, #42 Response to Motion, by Defendants David Dempster, Group Health System. (Sherwood, Skylar)
July 13, 2020 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Keith D. Petrak filed by Defendants Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS, William Cammarano, Dennis DeLeon, Franciscan Health System, Tony Haftel, Bruce Megard, Kim Nighswager, Erin Seeberger re #34 MOTION Strike Defendants' filings And to purge false records And to invalidate the proceeding in this court (Petrak, Keith)
July 13, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE, by Defendants Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS, William Cammarano, Dennis DeLeon, Franciscan Health System, Tony Haftel, Bruce Megard, Kim Nighswager, Erin Seeberger, to #34 MOTION Strike Defendants' filings And to purge false records And to invalidate the proceeding in this court . (Petrak, Keith)
July 13, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE, by Defendant Group Health System, to #34 MOTION Strike Defendants' filings And to purge false records And to invalidate the proceeding in this court . (Moniz, Donna)
July 10, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Alaa Elkharwily, TO RESPONSE to #33 MOTION for Relief from deadline to file a brief (Elkharwily, Alaa)
July 10, 2020 Filing 39 STRICKEN PER FILER'S REQUEST, SEE #40 FOR CORRECTED REPLY. REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Alaa Elkharwily, TO RESPONSE to #33 MOTION for Relief from deadline to file a brief (Elkharwily, Alaa) Modified on 7/13/2020 (ERA).
July 8, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #36 Response to Motion,, by Defendant Group Health System. (Moniz, Donna)
July 8, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #36 Response to Motion,, by Defendants David Dempster, Group Health System. (Sherwood, Skylar)
July 8, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE, by Defendants Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS, William Cammarano, Dennis DeLeon, Franciscan Health System, Tony Haftel, Bruce Megard, Kim Nighswager, Erin Seeberger, to #33 MOTION for Relief from deadline to file a brief. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thorsvig, Amanda)
July 6, 2020 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT filed by Plaintiff Alaa Elkharwily re #34 MOTION Strike Defendants' filings And to purge false records And to invalidate the proceeding in this court Affidavit of Brian Dykman (Elkharwily, Alaa)
July 2, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION Strike Defendants' filings And to purge false records And to invalidate the proceeding in this court , filed by Plaintiff Alaa Elkharwily. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Elkharwily and attached exhibits, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/17/2029, (Elkharwily, Alaa)
July 2, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Relief from deadline to file a brief, filed by Plaintiff Alaa Elkharwily. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/10/2020, (Elkharwily, Alaa)
July 2, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Skylar A. Sherwood filed by Defendants David Dempster, Group Health System re #31 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sherwood, Skylar)
July 2, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants David Dempster, Group Health System. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/24/2020, (Sherwood, Skylar)
July 1, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #27 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington. Filed by Defendant Group Health System. Noting Date 7/24/2020, (Moniz, Donna)
July 1, 2020 Filing 29 PRAECIPE re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington by Defendant Group Health System (Moniz, Donna)
June 29, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #28 Proposed Order, #26 MOTION to Remand to Pierce County State Court: Modified to identify #26 -2 as duplicative of #26 -1 and to correctly identify #28 as Proposed Order. (SP)
June 29, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Remand PROPOSED ORDER, filed by Plaintiff Alaa Elkharwily re #26 Motion to Remand to Pierce County State Court. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 7/24/2020, (Elkharwily, Alaa) Modified on 6/29/2020 to identify as Proposed Order not a Motion (SP).
June 29, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, filed by Defendant Group Health System. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Brennen Johnson, #3 Johnson Dec Exhibit 1, #4 Johnson DecExhibit 2, #5 Johnson DecExhibit 3, #6 Johnson DecExhibit 4, #7 Johnson DecExhibit 5, #8 Johnson DecExhibit 6, #9 Johnson DecExhibit 7, #10 Johnson DecExhibit 8, #11 Johnson DecExhibit 9, #12 Johnson DecExhibit 10) Noting Date 6/24/2020, (Moniz, Donna)
June 29, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Remand to Pierce County State Court, filed by Plaintiff Alaa Elkharwily. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration Of Elkharwily and attached exhibits, #2 Proposed Order proposed order duplicative entry: See attachment (1)) Noting Date 7/24/2020, (Elkharwily, Alaa) Modified on 6/29/2020 (SP).
June 27, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE Corporate Disclosure Statement ; filed by Defendant Group Health System. (Moniz, Donna)
June 25, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #23 MOTION to Dismiss Party and Request for Judicial Notice, by Defendants William Cammarano, Dennis DeLeon, Franciscan Health System, Tony Haftel, Kim Nighswager. (Thorsvig, Amanda)
June 25, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Party and Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Defendants Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS, Bruce Megard, Erin Seeberger. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/17/2020, (Petrak, Keith)
June 25, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Skylar A Sherwood on behalf of Defendants David Dempster, Group Health System. (Sherwood, Skylar)
June 25, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Group Health System must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/2/2020. (GMR)
June 25, 2020 Attorney Brennen Johnson added for Defendant Group Health System; per #21 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
June 25, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: attorney, Skylar Sherwood, signer of the #20 Corporate Disclosure Statement as counsel for defendants Washington Permanente Medical Group and David Dempster, M.D., has not properly appeared before the Court in this matter. If counsel intends to proceed as part of this case, a Notice of Appearance is required and shall be promptly filed. Thank you. (GMR- cc: S. Sherwood via ad hoc)
June 24, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donna Maria Moniz on behalf of Defendant Group Health System. (Moniz, Donna)
June 12, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Group Health System (Sherwood, Skylar)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald B. Leighton is recused from the matter and no longer assigned to the case. Entered as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/8/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/24/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/31/2020, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 9, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Catholic Health Initiatives for Franciscan Health System. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Franciscan Health System (Thorsvig, Amanda)
June 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE: Plaintiff Alaa Elkharwily has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case (plaintiff confirmed via phone call that he is selecting option to file documents electronically and receive service of documents and notice of electronic filings via email). (KB)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. The Honorable J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (KAM)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS, Bruce Megard, Erin Seeberger (Petrak, Keith)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:15-cv-05579-RJB; 3:17-cv-05838-RBL, by Defendants Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS, Bruce Megard, Erin Seeberger. (Petrak, Keith)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS (Petrak, Keith)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants David Dempster, Group Health System, Kaiser Permanente. (Sherwood, Skylar)
June 4, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Franciscan Health System must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/11/2020. (GMR)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Scott M O'Halloran on behalf of Defendants William Cammarano, Dennis DeLeon, Franciscan Health System, Tony Haftel, Kim Nighswager. (O'Halloran, Scott)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Amanda K Thorsvig on behalf of Defendants William Cammarano, Dennis DeLeon, Franciscan Health System, Tony Haftel, Kim Nighswager. (Thorsvig, Amanda)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendants William Cammarano, Dennis DeLeon, Franciscan Health System, Tony Haftel, Kim Nighswager. (Thorsvig, Amanda)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 Notice AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS, Bruce Megard, Erin Seeberger. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-10)(Keller, Bradley) Modified on 6/3/2020 (GMR).
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 6/8/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 6/8/2020. (KB)
June 1, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/8/2020. (KB)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (KB) cc to plaintiff via USPS, C/O attorney Brian Dykman.
June 1, 2020 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (KB)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 20-2-06061-1; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6369856) Attorney Bradley S Keller added to party Bennett Bigelow(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley S Keller added to party Bruce Megard(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley S Keller added to party Erin Seeberger(pty:dft), filed by Bruce Megard, Bennett Bigelow, Erin Seeberger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2-7)(Keller, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elkharwily v. Kaiser Permanente et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Haftel
Represented By: Amanda K Thorsvig
Represented By: Scott M O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett Bigelow
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscan Health System
Represented By: Amanda K Thorsvig
Represented By: Scott M O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Seeberger
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: Keith David Petrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Health System
Represented By: Donna Maria Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis DeLeon
Represented By: Amanda K Thorsvig
Represented By: Scott M O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dempster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Nighswager
Represented By: Amanda K Thorsvig
Represented By: Scott M O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Megard
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: Keith David Petrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cammarano
Represented By: Amanda K Thorsvig
Represented By: Scott M O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Mary Doe I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett Bigelow & Leedom PS
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: Keith David Petrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaa Elkharwily
Represented By: Alaa Elkharwily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?