Stevens
Petitioner: Jeremy Thomas Stevens
Case Number: 3:2020cv05521
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul Douglas Weisser on behalf of Respondent Daniel White. **PRINT ALL**(Jeremy Stevens, Prisoner ID: 376553)(Weisser, Paul)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. To consent to a US Magistrate Judge, return the executed form by 7/31/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jeremy Stevens, Prisoner ID: 376553)(SP)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADDING RESPONDENT AND FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 2254 PETITION by E-Mail upon the Respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. ( #3 Petition, this Order and Notice of Option to Consent emailed 7/1/2020) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jeremy Stevens, Prisoner ID: 376553)(SP)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jeremy Thomas Stevens. (Receipt # TAC016340) **16 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeremy Stevens, Prisoner ID: 376553)(SP)
June 16, 2020 FILING FEE RECEIVED: $ 5.00, receipt number TAC016340. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeremy Stevens, Prisoner ID: 376553)(GMR)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency: - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $5.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status. Filer has until 7/6/2020 to correct. (Attachments: #1 Habeas IFP Form (blank)) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jeremy Stevens, Prisoner ID: 376553)(SP)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 PROPOSED Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner Jeremy Thomas Stevens. (No Filing Fee or IFP Application) **16 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeremy Stevens, Prisoner ID: 376553)(SP) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/3/2020) (SP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremy Thomas Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?