Long et al v. Pacific Women's Center LLC et al
Plaintiff: Emi C Long, Emi C Farley and Kirk P Farley
Defendant: Corey Sullivan, Pacific Women's Center LLC, Providence St Joseph Health, John Ngo, Richard Beyerlein, Arin Braseth, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Medical Care Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Providence Health & Services and Providence Health & Services - Washington
Case Number: 3:2020cv05616
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 84 Case transferred in from District of Oregon, Case Number 6:19-cv-01942.
June 24, 2020 Filing 83 JUDGMENT: Based on the stipulation, #80 , the claims against Pacific Womens Center, LLC and Richard Beyerlein, M.D are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Based on the record, the claims against Defendants Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, and Bayer Medical Care, Inc. are DISMISSED, with prejudice and the remaining claims are transferred to the Western Division of Washington in Tacoma. Signed on 6/24/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Opinion and Order: Bayer's Motion to Dismiss, #48 , is granted and Plaintiffs' claims against the Bayer defendants are dismissed, with prejudice. The Court grants the Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer, #50 . Plaintiffs' claims against Doctor Ngo, Doctor Braseth, Doctor Sullivan, and the Providence Defendants are transferred to the Western District of Washington in Tacoma. Signed on 6/24/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 81 MINUTES of Proceedings: Motion Hearing Held. Motion is taken under advisement as of 6/18/2020. Robert S. Wagner present as counsel for plaintiffs. Chad Beck, Bertha Fitzer, David Metham, Ramone Henderson, Nancy M. Erfle, Benjamin J. Whiting and Luke Beasley present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Kelly Polvi. Judge Michael J. McShane presiding. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 80 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal of Party Filed by Richard Beyerlein, Pacific Women's Center, LLC. (Welborn, Gordon) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane: Oral Argument is set for 6/18/2020 at 02:00PM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane. The Court will provide the parties with the conference call-in number by separate email. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 78 Sur-Reply to Reply to Motion #74 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Arin Braseth, John Ngo. (Fitzer, Bertha) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: Granting Motion for Joinder #72 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 76 Declaration of Eric A. Norman In Support of Reply. Filed by Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington, Providence St. Joseph Health, Corey Sullivan. (Related document(s): Reply in Support of Their Joinder to Motion for Joinder #75 .) (Norman, Eric) Modified on 5/12/2020 to correct document link. Notice of Electronic Filing regenerated to the parties. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 75 Reply in Support of Their Joinder to Motion for Joinder #72 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington, Providence St. Joseph Health, Corey Sullivan. (Norman, Eric) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 74 Reply In Support Of to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #50 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Arin Braseth, John Ngo. (Fitzer, Bertha) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #50 . Reply is due by 5/8/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 72 Motion for Joinder . Filed by Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington, Providence St. Joseph Health, Corey Sullivan. (Norman, Eric) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 71 First Motion for Extension of Time to file reply to response to motion to dismiss. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #50 and Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #64 .) Filed by John Ngo. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Mepham, David) Modified on 5/4/2020 to correct event selection and create document link. Notice of Electronic Filing regenerated to the parties. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 70 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #48 . Filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Medical Care, Inc.. (Erfle, Nancy) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 69 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #60 Response in Opposition to Motion. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 68 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #64 Response in Opposition to Motion. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 67 Corrected Certificate of Service by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long of Response in Opposition to Motion, #64 Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 66 Declaration of Robert S. Wagner . Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #64 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 65 Declaration of Kirk Farley . Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #64 .) (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 64 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #50 , Motion for Joinder #51 ORAL ARGUMENT requested. Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Wagner, Robert) (Main Document 64 replaced on 4/14/2020) (cw). (Main Document 64 replaced on 4/14/2020) (cw). [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #50 . Response is due by 4/10/2020. Reply is due by 5/1/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 62 Declaration of Robert S Wagner . Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion #61 .) (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 61 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #50 . Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 60 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #48 ORAL ARGUMENT requested. Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Wagner, Robert) (Main Document 60 replaced on 4/14/2020) (cw). [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #48 and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #50 . Response is due by 4/3/2020. Reply is due by 4/24/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) Modified on 3/25/2020 to correct Response deadline, resent NEF (cp). [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 58 Declaration of Robert S. Wagner . Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion #57 , Motion for Joinder, #51 .) (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #50 . Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Granting Motion for Joinder #51 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #48 and #50 . Response is due by 3/27/2020. Reply is due by 4/17/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 54 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Medical Care, Inc.. (Erfle, Nancy) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 53 Declaration of Robert S. Wagner . Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion, #52 .) (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 52 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #50 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #48 , Motion for Joinder #51 . Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 51 Motion for Joinder . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington, Providence St. Joseph Health, Corey Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Eric A. Norman) (Norman, Eric) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 50 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Change or Transfer Venue . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Arin Braseth, John Ngo. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Dr. Braseth, #2 Attachment Declaration of Dr. Ngo, #3 Attachment Declaration of Dr. Burtner) (Mepham, David) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 49 Declaration of Nancy M. Erfle . Filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Medical Care, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #48 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Erfle, Nancy) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 48 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Medical Care, Inc.. (Erfle, Nancy) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #45 for Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6293291. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #43 for Benjamin J. Whiting. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6292541. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6293291 #45 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #45 .) (ck) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin J. Whiting. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6292541 #43 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #43 .) (ck) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6293291. Filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Medical Care, Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #31 for Luke C. Beasley. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6205764. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin J. Whiting. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6292541. Filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Medical Care, Inc.. (Whiting, Benjamin) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 42 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by John Ngo waiver sent on 2/5/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 41 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Arin Braseth waiver sent on 2/5/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #37 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Luke C. Beasley. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6205764 #31 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #31 .) (ck) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 39 Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington, Corey Sullivan, Providence St. Joseph Health. (Norman, Eric) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Medical Care, Inc.. (Erfle, Nancy) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6210883 #37 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #37 .) (ck) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6210883. Filed by Arin Braseth. (Fitzer, Bertha) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Richard Beyerlein, Pacific Women's Center, LLC. (Welborn, Gordon) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 35 Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Richard Beyerlein, Pacific Women's Center, LLC. (Welborn, Gordon) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane: Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion to Dismiss #30 is granted. Motion to Dismiss to be filed by 2/20/2020. Response is due by 3/19/2020. Reply is due by 4/2/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington, Providence St. Joseph Health. (Norman, Eric) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance of Eric A. Norman appearing on behalf of Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington, Providence St. Joseph Health, Corey Sullivan Filed by on behalf of Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington, Providence St. Joseph Health, Corey Sullivan. (Norman, Eric) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Luke C. Beasley. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6205764. Filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Medical Care, Inc.. (Erfle, Nancy) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 30 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,, #1 . Filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Medical Care, Inc.. (Erfle, Nancy) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance of Nancy M. Erfle appearing on behalf of Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Medical Care, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Medical Care, Inc.. (Erfle, Nancy) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 28 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #15 upon Corey Sullivan served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 27 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #8 upon Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 26 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #7 upon Bayer Healthcare, LLC served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 25 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #9 upon Bayer Medical Care, Inc. served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 24 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #14 upon Providence Health & Services - Washington served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 23 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #12 upon Providence St. Joseph Health served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 22 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #13 upon Providence Health & Services served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 21 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #10 upon Richard Beyerlein served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 20 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #11 upon Pacific Women's Center, LLC served on 1/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance of Erika Lyn Wilson appearing on behalf of Richard Beyerlein, Pacific Women's Center, LLC Filed by on behalf of Richard Beyerlein, Pacific Women's Center, LLC. (Wilson, Erika) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance of Gordon L. Welborn appearing on behalf of Richard Beyerlein, Pacific Women's Center, LLC Filed by on behalf of Richard Beyerlein, Pacific Women's Center, LLC. (Welborn, Gordon) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued Electronically as to John Ngo. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued Electronically as to Arin Braseth. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued Electronically as to Corey Sullivan. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued Electronically as to Providence Health & Services - Washington. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Providence Health & Services. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Providence St. Joseph Health. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to Pacific Women's Center, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard Beyerlein. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bayer Medical Care, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bayer Healthcare, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6102504. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Robert Wagner. Related Doc #4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (ljp) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 3 . Filed by Kirk P. Farley, Emi C. Long. (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by Emi C. Long, Kirk P Farley in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 12/12/2019. (nd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/31/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/30/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/30/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6102542 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Emi C Long, Kirk P Farley against Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare, LLC, Bayer Medical Care, Inc., Richard Beyerlein, Arin Braseth, John Ngo, Pacific Women's Center, LLC, Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington, Providence St. Joseph Health, Corey Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Wagner, Robert) [Transferred from ord on 6/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long et al v. Pacific Women's Center LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emi C Long
Represented By: David K Miller
Represented By: Robert S Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emi C Farley
Represented By: David K Miller
Represented By: Robert S Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk P Farley
Represented By: David K Miller
Represented By: Robert S Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Sullivan
Represented By: Eric A Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Women's Center LLC
Represented By: Erika Lyn Wilson
Represented By: Gordon L Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence St Joseph Health
Represented By: Eric A Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ngo
Represented By: Bertha B Fitzer
Represented By: David S Mepham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Beyerlein
Represented By: Erika Lyn Wilson
Represented By: Gordon L Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arin Braseth
Represented By: Bertha B Fitzer
Represented By: David S Mepham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Kaspar Stoffelmayr
Represented By: Luke Beasley
Represented By: Nancy M Erfle
Represented By: Benjamin J Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Medical Care Inc
Represented By: Kaspar Stoffelmayr
Represented By: Luke Beasley
Represented By: Nancy M Erfle
Represented By: Benjamin J Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Kaspar Stoffelmayr
Represented By: Luke Beasley
Represented By: Nancy M Erfle
Represented By: Benjamin J Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services
Represented By: Eric A Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services - Washington
Represented By: Eric A Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?