Bartlett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael Bartlett
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv05693
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Net Worth and Payment of EAJA Fees by Plaintiff Michael Bartlett (Halpern, Elie)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint Attorney General, Office of General Counsel and US Attorney's Office by Plaintiff Michael Bartlett on 09/04/2020 (Halpern, Elie)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Michael Bartlett for Service of Summons and Complaint (Halpern, Elie)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (TW)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Summons(es) as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Michael Bartlett.(TW)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke.(TW)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (TW)
July 20, 2020 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (GMR)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Michael Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Halpern, Elie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bartlett
Represented By: Elie Halpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?