Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Katherine A Brown
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv05695
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (KMP)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Katherine A Brown.(KMP)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(KMP)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Katherine A Brown.(Yanich, Eitan)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (KMP)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF IFP DEFICIENCY: - The IFP Application is missing signature(s). Please file a properly signed IFP Application using the event "Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis" under the "Complaints and Other Initiating Documents" category. Filer has until 8/19/2020 to correct. (GMR)
July 20, 2020 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (GMR)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Katherine A Brown. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Declaration of Eitan Yanich)(Yanich, Eitan) Modified on 7/20/2020 (GMR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine A Brown
Represented By: Eitan Kassel Yanich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?