Oakes v. Sinclair et al
Plaintiff: David Oakes
Defendant: United States of America, United States Department of Veteran Affairs, Michael Sinclair, Jane Doe Sinclair and United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 3:2020cv05822
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1364
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Substitution pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2679(d)(1) ; filed by Defendants Jane Doe Sinclair, Michael Sinclair, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Scope of US Attorney Brian T. Moran)(Waldrop, Matt)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matt Waldrop on behalf of Defendants Jane Doe Sinclair, Michael Sinclair, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Waldrop, Matt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States of America on 8/25/2020, filed by Plaintiff David Oakes. (Martin, Thaddeus)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on US Dept of Veteran Affairs on 8/25/2020, filed by Plaintiff David Oakes. (Martin, Thaddeus)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jane Doe Sinclair on 9/29/2020, filed by Plaintiff David Oakes. (Martin, Thaddeus)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Michael Sinclair on 9/29/2020, filed by Plaintiff David Oakes. (Martin, Thaddeus)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 11/18/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/4/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/12/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Jane Doe Sinclair, Michael Sinclair, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, and United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(SP)
August 19, 2020 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6535519) Attorney Thaddeus P Martin added to party David Oakes(pty:pla), filed by David Oakes. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Thaddeus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakes v. Sinclair et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sinclair
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Sinclair
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oakes
Represented By: Thaddeus P Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?