Symbology Innovations LLC v. Prototek Corporation
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations LLC
Defendant: Prototek Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv05871
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Symbology Innovations LLC.(Curfman, Andrew)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew S Curfman for Counter Defendant Symbology Innovations LLC, and Plaintiff Symbology Innovations LLC by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew Curfman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Defendant Symbology Innovations LLC, Plaintiff Symbology Innovations LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6646734 (Ranallo, Nicholas)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Prototek Corporation (Glisic, Mario)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND Attorney Mario V Glisic added to party Prototek Corporation(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Symbology Innovations LLC by Prototek Corporation.(Glisic, Mario)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/30/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (ERA)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Symbology Innovations LLC. (ERA)
August 31, 2020 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ERA)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC, Other Affiliate Leigh Rothschild for Symbology Innovations LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Symbology Innovations LLC (Ranallo, Nicholas)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Prototek Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6560960) Attorney Nicholas R. Ranallo added to party Symbology Innovations LLC(pty:pla), filed by Symbology Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Ranallo, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symbology Innovations LLC v. Prototek Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations LLC
Represented By: Nicholas R. Ranallo
Represented By: Andrew S Curfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prototek Corporation
Represented By: Mario V Glisic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?