Massey v. MultiCare Health System et al
Plaintiff: Lori Anna Massey
Defendant: Allenmore Hospital and MultiCare Health System
Case Number: 3:2020cv05922
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Proposed Complaint/Attachments 1-11. Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. Please file a redacted version of the document as soon as practicable. This will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (SP)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency: - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- A completed Civil Cover Sheet must be filed. Filer has until 10/15/2020 to correct. (SP)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from Clerk to parties re receipt of case from the Central District of California and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
September 15, 2020 Judge James L. Robart added. (SP)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from the Central District of California - Riverside, Case Number 5:20-cv-01610. Documents 1-8 received electronically.
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS ORDERED that this action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. (See document for details.) (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es) [Transferred from cacd on 9/15/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55945 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #6 as to USCA TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/APPEAL NUMBER 20-55945 as to the #6 Notice of Appeal, filed by plaintiff Lori Anna Massey. (es)[Transferred from cacd on 9/15/2020.] Modified on 9/15/2020 (SP).
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL (20-55945) to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Lori Anna Massey. In forma pauperis is pending. (mat) [Transferred from cacd on 9/15/2020.] Modified on 9/15/2020 to add CCA# only (SP).
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis filed by plaintiff Lori Anna Massey. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (mat) [Transferred from cacd on 9/15/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 9/15/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Lori Anna Massey. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 9/15/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lori Anna Massey, (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 9/15/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 PROPOSED COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Allenmore Hospital, MultiCare Health System. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. Filed by Plaintiff Lori Anna Massey. (Attachments: SEALED #1 Part 2 of Complaint, SEALED #2 Part 3 of Complaint, SEALED #3 Part 4 of Complaint, SEALED #4 Part 5 of Complaint, SEALED #5 Part 6 of Complaint, SEALED #6 Part 7 of Complaint, SEALED #7 Part 8 of Complaint, SEALED #8 Part 9 of Complaint, SEALED #9 Part 10 of Complaint, SEALED #10 Part 11 of Complaint, SEALED #11 Part 12 of Complaint, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons) (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 9/15/2020.] Modified on 9/15/2020 (SP). Modified on 9/15/2020 (SP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey v. MultiCare Health System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allenmore Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MultiCare Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Anna Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?