Westover et al v. Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Randolff Scott Ruffell Westover and Andrea Westover
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv05931
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Attorneys D Michael Reilly and Michael Mackenzie Brown added for Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, per #4 Notice of Appearance. (KMC)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Denton, Stephania)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company (Denton, Stephania)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephania Camp Denton on behalf of Defendant Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Denton, Stephania)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/14/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/21/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. (SP)
September 21, 2020 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against defendant(s) Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6606291), filed by Randolff Scott Ruffell Westover, Andrea Westover. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Evans, McKean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westover et al v. Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolff Scott Ruffell Westover
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Represented By: McKean J Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Westover
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Represented By: McKean J Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Represented By: Michael Mackenzie Brown
Represented By: Stephania Camp Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?