Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dollar Tree Distribution Inc
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Dollar Tree Distribution Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv05959
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Attorneys Beth G Joffe and Priya Bhoplay Vivian added for Dollar Tree Distribution Inc, per #5 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (Reilly, D) Modified on 11/4/2020 (KMC).
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dollar Tree Distribution Inc.(Reilly, D)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dollar Tree, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dollar Tree Distribution Inc (Reilly, D)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney D Michael Reilly on behalf of Defendant Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (Reilly, D)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/24/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/31/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. c/o C T Corporation System, Registered Agent on 10/5/2020, filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Lee, Damien)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (ERA)
September 30, 2020 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ERA)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Dollar Tree Distribution Inc, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, Roberta) (No Fee Required)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dollar Tree Distribution Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Distribution Inc
Represented By: Priya Bhoplay Vivian
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Represented By: Beth G Joffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Roberta Steele
Represented By: Damien Anthony Lee
Represented By: John Freeman Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?