Denton v. Thrasher et al
Plaintiff: Michael Denton
Defendant: T Sharp, Troy Aidan, Ron Haynes, Bill Tuffreee, W Hull, Stephanie Baltzell, Stephen Sinclair, A Collechi, Scott Frakes, Vincent Stroup, Kern Tyler, Karie Rainer, Peterson, Gabe Forrest, William Barr, Tim Thrasher, Mario Fernandez, Scott Russell, Donald Evans, Karlyanna Roberts-Green, Joshua Sutherby, Snyderwease and Thomas L'Heureux
Case Number: 3:2020cv05968
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle M. Young on behalf of Defendant Stephen Sinclair. **PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(Young, Michelle)
October 30, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura re Plaintiff's #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. Noting Date: 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)**7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. To consent to a US Magistrate Judge, return the executed form by 11/30/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by E-Mail to the named defendants (23); signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. ( #14 Amended Complaint, this Order, notice of lawsuit and waiver of service, and notice of option to consent emailed 10/30/2020) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 30, 2020 Check status of service waivers per #15 Order Directing Service due by 12/7/2020. **DO NOT PRINT**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Troy Aidan, Stephanie Baltzell, William Barr, A Collechi, Donald Evans, Mario Fernandez, Gabe Forrest, Scott Frakes, Ron Haynes, W Hull, Thomas L'Heureux, Peterson, Karie Rainer, Karlyanna Roberts-Green, Scott Russell, T Sharp, Stephen Sinclair, Snyderwease, Vincent Stroup, Joshua Sutherby, Tim Thrasher, Bill Tuffreee, and Kern Tyler, filed by Michael Denton. **115 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT: The clerk's office shall docket the proposed amended complaint as the operative complaint in this matter; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Michael Denton re #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Michael Denton. **11 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Michael Denton. Noted by clerk for: 10/28/2020. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint re #9 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Michael Denton. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) Noting Date 11/13/2020, **117 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Troy Aidan, Stephanie Baltzell, William Barr, A Collechi, Donald Evans, Mario Fernandez, Gabe Forrest, Scott Frakes, Ron Haynes, W Hull, Peterson, Karie Rainer, Scott Russell, T Sharp, Stephen Sinclair, Vincent Stroup, Tim Thrasher, Bill Tuffreee, and Kern Tyler with JURY DEMAND, filed by Michael Denton. (IFP Granted) **107 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Michael Denton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Proposed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)**16 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Michael Denton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)**118 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2020: #2 Summons) (SP). Modified on 10/23/2020 (SP).
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael Denton. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency: - Please provide a more current certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 11/9/2020 to correct. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael Denton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)**113 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denton v. Thrasher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Aidan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Tuffreee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Baltzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sinclair
Represented By: Michelle M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Collechi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Stroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karie Rainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabe Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Thrasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karlyanna Roberts-Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Sutherby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snyderwease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L'Heureux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?