Thomas et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Kristen Thomas and Dustin Thomas
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv05982
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES - *FOUR DAY* Jury Trial is set for 1/25/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Joinder of Parties due by 12/21/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/19/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 8/18/2021, Motions due by 8/30/2021, Discovery completed by 9/27/2021, Dispositive motions due by 10/27/2021, Motions in Limine due by 12/20/2021, Pretrial Order due by 1/3/2022, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 1/4/2022, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 1/4/2022, Deposition Designations due by 1/4/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2022 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom E. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 3-4. (Thede, Nicholas)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Foley, Douglas)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) State Farm Fire and Casualty Company with JURY DEMAND, filed by Dustin Thomas, Kristen Thomas.(Thede, Nicholas)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/24/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/31/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Foley, Douglas)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MET) ad hoc Kyle Sturm
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MET)
October 2, 2020 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (MET)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co as Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Foley, Douglas) Modified on 10/2/2020 to add corporate parent (MET).
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 20-2-01725-06; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6639179), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2020: #4 State Court Complaint) (MET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Thomas
Represented By: Nicholas A. Thede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Thomas
Represented By: Nicholas A. Thede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Vernon Scott Finley
Represented By: Douglas F Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?