Bowes et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Teddy Bowes and Leslie Bowes
Defendant: United States and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv06008
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alexander Stevko on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
December 9, 2020 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/9/2020, (Stevko, Alexander)
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Commissioner Charles P. Rettig, Internal Revenue Service on 10/29/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Leslie Bowes, Teddy Bowes. (Schumacher, Scott)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States Attorney General William P. Barr on 10/29/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Leslie Bowes, Teddy Bowes. (Schumacher, Scott)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States Attorney for the Western District of Washington Brian T. Moran on 10/29/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Leslie Bowes, Teddy Bowes. (Schumacher, Scott)
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 REDACTION to #1 Complaint,,, Redacted Exhibit D by Plaintiffs Leslie Bowes, Teddy Bowes (Schumacher, Scott)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 REDACTION to #1 Complaint,,, Redacted Exhibit A by Plaintiffs Leslie Bowes, Teddy Bowes (Schumacher, Scott)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 PRAECIPE to attach document (Amended Signature Page) re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiffs Leslie Bowes, Teddy Bowes (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Amended Signature Page)(Schumacher, Scott)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/26/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/12/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/19/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Leslie Bowes, Teddy Bowes (Schumacher, Scott)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency - Missing Signatures and Improper Jury Demand** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Corrected signature page must be filed by 11/2/2020. (KB)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons Commissioner Charles P. Rettig, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney Brian T. Moran).(KB)
October 19, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Exhibits A and D contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2 (please note that names of minor children must be redacted to the initials). You are required to re-file a redacted version Exhibits A and D only using the event Redacted Document located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the documents have been administratively sealed by the Court. (KB)
October 19, 2020 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (KB)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Leslie Bowes, Teddy Bowes (Schumacher, Scott)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Leslie Bowes, Teddy Bowes (Schumacher, Scott)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Leslie Bowes, Teddy Bowes (Schumacher, Scott)
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States of America with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6657628) Attorney Scott A Schumacher added to party Leslie Bowes(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Schumacher added to party Teddy Bowes(pty:pla), filed by Teddy Bowes, Leslie Bowes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , SEALED DOCUMENT #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, SEALED DOCUMENT #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Schumacher, Scott) Modified on 10/14/2020 to remove duplicate text (KMC). Modified on 10/19/2020 to strike jury demand language and to seal Exhibits A and D - Documents contains personal identifiers. Documents sealed pursuant to LCR 5.2. Properly redacted documents will be filed by Counsel (KB). (Attachment 9 replaced on 10/19/2020) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowes et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander Stevko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Bowes
Represented By: John Alfred Clynch, Jr.
Represented By: Scott A Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Bowes
Represented By: John Alfred Clynch, Jr.
Represented By: Scott A Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?