Hayes v. Slankrd et al
Plaintiff: Robert L. Hayes and Robert L Hayes
Defendant: United Parcel Service, UPS, John Doe Slandkrd, Jeremy Doe, Becky Slankrd and United Parcel Services
Case Number: 3:2020cv06109
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Robert L Hayes re #8 Notice of Unavailability (PS)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Unavailability for Plaintiff Robert L Hayes from 12/22/2020 - 01/25/2021. (PS)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 TRAVERSE/RESPONSE to #6 Answer, filed by Plaintiff Robert L Hayes. (GMR)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint; by United Parcel Services.(Byers, Benjamin)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/1/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/8/2021, Joint Status Report due by 2/16/2021. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Tacoma address. (JL)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Tacoma address. (JL)
November 17, 2020 JSR due 2/16/2021. (JL)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (KB)
November 13, 2020 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (KB)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. for United Parcel Service. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by United Parcel Service (Byers, Benjamin)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number Case number not yet assigned; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6731366) Attorney Benjamin C Byers added to party United Parcel Service(pty:dft), filed by United Parcel Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Byers, Benjamin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #3 Complaint) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Slankrd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service
Represented By: Benjamin C Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS
Represented By: Benjamin C Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Slandkrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Slankrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Services
Represented By: Benjamin C Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?