MacArthur v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Aura MacArthur
Defendant: Does One Through Fifty and National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Case Number: 3:2020cv06200
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Yates, Andrew)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Initial Deadlines: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/4/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/11/2021, Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Wackerbarth, Tim)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Wackerbarth, Tim)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MET)
December 11, 2020 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (MET)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Andrew G. Yates re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wackerbarth, Tim)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 20-2-08605-9; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6800502), filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint)(Wackerbarth, Tim) Modified on 12/11/2020 (MET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacArthur v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does One Through Fifty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aura MacArthur
Represented By: Douglas T Weinmaster
Represented By: Andrew Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?