Wright v. Oaks et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Christopher Wright
Defendant: Brooks A Ray, Melissa Marie Oaks and Cidney Danuser
Case Number: 3:2020cv06229
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OR AMEND PROPOSED COMPLAINT on or before February 18, 2021, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR- cc: pltf w/forms)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Exhibits, filed by Plaintiff Stephen Christopher Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/22/2021, (PS) Modified on 1/13/2021 to reflect proposed (MET).
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter, ; filed by Plaintiff Stephen Christopher Wright. (PS)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER sent to Plaintiff re case number, judge assignment and case opening deficiency: - A completed Civil Cover Sheet must be filed. Please complete the included form and return for filing at your earliest convenience. Filer has until 1/20/2021 to correct. (GMR)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura, filed by Stephen Christopher Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Oaks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Marie Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cidney Danuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?