Markel American Insurance Company v. Frenette et al
Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Defendant: Premier Guide Service, LLC, Jeffrey Frenette and Premier Guide Service LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv05253
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #16 Answer to Complaint. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
May 19, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint; Attorney Daniel E Thenell added to party Jeffrey Frenette(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel E Thenell added to party Premier Guide Service LLC(pty:dft) by Jeffrey Frenette, Premier Guide Service LLC.(Thenell, Daniel)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to Consolidate with lead case C21-5132RJB, In the Matter of the Complaint of VIP Outdoors Inc for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as Owner of a 28' Willie M/V Nemesis. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
May 17, 2021 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jeffrey Frenette, Premier Guide Service LLC. (TC)
May 5, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Default against Jeffrey Frenette and Premier Guide Service, LLC,, filed by Plaintiff Markel American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/5/2021, (Jones, Jeremy)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/14/2021. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Premier Guide Services, LLC on 4/13/2021, filed by Plaintiff Markel American Insurance Company. (Jones, Jeremy)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jeffrey Frenette on 4/13/2021, filed by Plaintiff Markel American Insurance Company. (Jones, Jeremy)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Markel American Insurance Company re: #8 Order to Show Cause (Jones, Jeremy)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2021. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
April 14, 2021 Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2021. (JL)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/28/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/6/2021, Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2021. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
April 12, 2021 JSR due 7/12/2021. (JL)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:21-cv-05132, by Plaintiff Markel American Insurance Company. (Jones, Jeremy)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency - Notice of Related Cases Omitted. ***Action Required***See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 4/14/2021. (GMR)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Jeffrey Frenette, Premier Guide Service LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GMR)
April 9, 2021 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (GMR)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Markel American Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Markel American Insurance Company (Jones, Jeremy)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Jeffrey Frenette, Premier Guide Service, LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-7032346), filed by Markel American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Jones, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markel American Insurance Company v. Frenette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeremy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Guide Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Frenette
Represented By: Daniel E Thenell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Guide Service LLC
Represented By: Daniel E Thenell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?