Hilliard et al v. Maxim Healthcare Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Trisha Arroyo and Justin Hilliard
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-50, Corporations 1-50, Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc., Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc., Maxim Healthcare Services Inc and Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv05290
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 17 Second MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew Herman, filed by Plaintiff Justin Hilliard. Noting Date 7/16/2021, (Weinmaster, Douglas)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Plaintiff Counsel's #14 Motion for Leave to Withdraw. Mr. Weinmaster is no longer counsel of record for plaintiff. Mr. Andy Herman remains as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
May 26, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw, filed by Plaintiff Justin Hilliard. Noting Date 6/24/2021, (Weinmaster, Douglas)
May 18, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Notice re Lack of Proper Signature: this entry has been stricken from the docket as it was made in error. Please disregard. (LH)
May 17, 2021 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Leave to Withdraw, filed by Plaintiff Justin Hilliard. Noting Date 6/4/2021, (Weinmaster, Douglas) Modified title on 5/18/2021 (LH).
May 14, 2021 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #13 Motion for Leave was improperly signed by Doug Weinmaster. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (LH) Modified to strike entry on 5/18/2021. Posted in error. (LH).
May 13, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw, filed by Plaintiff Justin Hilliard. Noting Date 6/4/2021, (Weinmaster, Douglas)
May 6, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Dkt. #10 : Changed document name from Verification of State Court Records to Declaration re Verification of State Court Records. (LH)
May 5, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Maxim Healthcare Services Inc, Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services Inc (Mandt, Heidi)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 6/2/2021, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Heidi L. Mandt re #9 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #9 Verification of State Court Records Declaration of Heidi L. Mandt by Defendants Maxim Healthcare Services Inc, Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Mandt, Heidi) Modified to correct name of filing on 5/6/2021 (LH).
May 5, 2021 Filing 9 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Maxim Healthcare Services Inc, Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services Inc (Mandt, Heidi)
April 28, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Maxim Healthcare Services Inc, Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services Inc. (Mandt, Heidi) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/28/2021 to flatten malformed PDF) (MET).
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SP)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
April 28, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Maxim Healthcare Services Inc and Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/5/2021. (SP)
April 28, 2021 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SP)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc., Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc.. (Mandt, Heidi)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc., Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc. (Mandt, Heidi)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Heidi L. Mandt re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc., Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc. (Mandt, Heidi)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Heidi L Mandt on behalf of Defendants Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc., Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc.. (Mandt, Heidi)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 21-2-05453-8; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7053726) Attorney Heidi L Mandt added to party Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Heidi L Mandt added to party Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc.(pty:dft), filed by Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc., Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Mandt, Heidi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilliard et al v. Maxim Healthcare Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporations 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Healthcare Services Inc
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services Inc
Represented By: Heidi L Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha Arroyo
Represented By: Douglas T Weinmaster
Represented By: Andrew Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Hilliard
Represented By: Douglas T Weinmaster
Represented By: Andrew Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?