Williams v. Daniel et al
Plaintiff: James Anthony Williams
Defendant: Elsie Stone, Urania, Helms, Carlyl, Evelyn Flores, Brewer, Hernandez, Wise, Archer and Paul H Daniel
Case Number: 3:2021cv05335
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. The #5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED. Should the plaintiff wish to proceed with this action, he must pay the $402 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(ST)
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge David W. Christel re #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by James Anthony Williams. The parties shall have fourteen (14) days from service of this Report to file written objections and the matter is set for consideration on 6/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)**7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(KMC)
May 18, 2021 SECOND NOTICE TO FILER re #4 Prison Trust Account Statement. NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Washington State Penitentiary. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(KMC)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by James Anthony Williams. (Attachments: #1 - Prison Trust Account Statement)**6 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(KMC)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 Prison Trust Account Statement, filed by Plaintiff James Anthony Williams. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(KMC)
May 10, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Washington State Penitentiary. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(KMC)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. ***Action Required*** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 6/9/2021 to correct. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(KMC)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff James Anthony Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)**82 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(KMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Daniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Anthony Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsie Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul H Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?