Fogg et al v. Selene Finance LP et al
Plaintiff: Edward Fogg and Maria Fogg
Defendant: Selene Finance LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB doing business as Christiana Trust, not individually but as trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust and Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB trustee for Premium Mortgage Acquisition Trust doing business as Christina Trust
Case Number: 3:2021cv05351
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/5/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/12/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, . by Selene Finance LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Hensrude, Gregor)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Selene Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Selene Ventures GP LLC, Other Affiliate Selene Ventures LLC, Other Affiliate Mortgage Solutions Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Pretium Partners LLC for Selene Finance LP. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Selene Finance LP (Hensrude, Gregor)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation for Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB (Hensrude, Gregor)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
May 14, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Selene Finance LP and Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/21/2021. (SP)
May 14, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 21-2-00797-06; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7079965), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, Selene Finance LP. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hensrude, Gregor) Modified on 5/14/2021 to identify State Court Complaint as attachment (SP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fogg et al v. Selene Finance LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Fogg
Represented By: John David Nellor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Fogg
Represented By: John David Nellor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance LP
Represented By: Anthony C Soldato
Represented By: Gregor A. Hensrude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB doing business as Christiana Trust, not individually but as trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust
Represented By: Anthony C Soldato
Represented By: Gregor A. Hensrude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB trustee for Premium Mortgage Acquisition Trust doing business as Christina Trust
Represented By: Anthony C Soldato
Represented By: Gregor A. Hensrude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?