First Bank v. Exodus et al
Plaintiff: First Bank
Defendant: F J Hankins Enterprises Inc, Fred J Hankins and Exodus
Case Number: 3:2021cv05412
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 954
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of Mailing To Interested Persons by Plaintiff First Bank (Darling, Lafcadio)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office re Order for Substitute Custodian on 6/16/2021 as to Buck Fowler, Marine Lenders Services Inc. (SR)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office re Vessel Arrest on 6/16/2021 as to Exodus. (SR)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian, Authorizing Movement and Inspection of Vessel and Collateral. Marine Lender Services, LLC is appointed substitute custodian of the Vessel and her appurtenances. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: USMO)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Arrest Vessel. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (Attachments: #1 Vessel Arrest Warrant) (LH) (cc: USMO)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by First Bank (Darling, Lafcadio)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Buck Fowler filed by Plaintiff First Bank re #3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian, Authorizing Movement and Inspection of Vessel and Collateral (Darling, Lafcadio)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) F J Hankins Enterprises Inc and Fred J Hankins. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SP)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian, Authorizing Movement and Inspection of Vessel and Collateral, filed by Plaintiff First Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Appointing Substitute Custodian)(Darling, Lafcadio)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Arrest of Vessel , filed by Plaintiff First Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Authorizing Issuance of Warrant For Arrest, #2 In Rem Arrest Warrant) Noting Date 6/2/2021, (Darling, Lafcadio)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (verified) to Foreclose Preferred Ship Mortgage In Rem, Enforcement of Security Interest, and For Debt against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7106591) Attorney Lafcadio H Darling added to party First Bank(pty:pla), filed by First Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Fred J. Hankins, #9 Summons F.J. Hankins Enterprises, Inc.)(Darling, Lafcadio)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) First Bank must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/8/2021. (SP)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge James L. Robart added. (SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Bank v. Exodus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F J Hankins Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred J Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exodus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Bank
Represented By: John E. Casperson
Represented By: Lafcadio H Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?