West v. Tigercat International Inc et al
Plaintiff: Isaac West
Defendant: KION Group AG, Triad Machinery, Inc., John Does 1-100, Hydra Dyne Tech, HydraForce, Inc., RYCO Hydraulics, Tigercat International, Inc., Vonberg Valve, Inc., Tigercat International Inc, Triad Machinery Inc, Vonberg Valve Inc, HydraForce Inc and KION Group AG a foreign corporation doing business as Linde Material Handling
Case Number: 3:2021cv05440
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Darrell L. Cochran filed by Plaintiff Isaac West re #18 MOTION to Appoint International Process Server (Cochran, Darrell)
July 26, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint International Process Server, filed by Plaintiff Isaac West. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/13/2021, (Cochran, Darrell)
July 21, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates Link-Belt Cranes LP, LLLP and Sumitomo Heavy Industries. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Triad Machinery Inc (Kincaid, William) Modified on 7/23/2021 to add corporate parent/affiliate info (SP).
July 19, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Tigercat International Inc.(Hunter, Ramona)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by John Edward Moore on behalf of Defendant Vonberg Valve Inc. (Moore, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Raymond Kincaid on behalf of Defendant Triad Machinery Inc. (Kincaid, William)
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Hydra Dyne Tech.(Scholnick, Bryan)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bryan D. Scholnick on behalf of Defendant Hydra Dyne Tech. (Scholnick, Bryan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Hailey K Delay on behalf of Defendant Tigercat International Inc. (Delay, Hailey)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramona Noel Hunter on behalf of Defendant Tigercat International Inc. (Hunter, Ramona)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #6 Notice of Appearance. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SP)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by HydraForce Inc (St Onge, Edward)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Vonberg Valve Inc (Tobias, Rachel)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul Xochihua Rachel Read Tobias on behalf of Defendant Vonberg Valve Inc. (Tobias, Rachel) Modified on 7/8/2021 to identify attorney filing appearance (SP).
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Francis S Floyd on behalf of Defendant Triad Machinery Inc. (Floyd, Francis)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 9/22/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/8/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/15/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Edward F St Onge, Jr on behalf of Defendant HydraForce Inc. (St Onge, Edward)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Hydra Dyne Tech, HydraForce Inc, KION Group AG, RYCO Hydraulics, Tigercat International Inc, Triad Machinery Inc, and Vonberg Valve Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(SP)
June 16, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7124611) Attorney Darrell L Cochran added to party Isaac West(pty:pla), filed by Isaac West. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Cochran, Darrell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Tigercat International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KION Group AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triad Machinery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hydra Dyne Tech
Represented By: Michael Kutzner
Represented By: Bryan D. Scholnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HydraForce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYCO Hydraulics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tigercat International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vonberg Valve, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tigercat International Inc
Represented By: Hailey K Delay
Represented By: Ramona Noel Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triad Machinery Inc
Represented By: Francis S Floyd
Represented By: William Raymond Kincaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vonberg Valve Inc
Represented By: Paul R Xochihua
Represented By: John Edward Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HydraForce Inc
Represented By: Edward F St Onge, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KION Group AG a foreign corporation doing business as Linde Material Handling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac West
Represented By: Alexander G Dietz
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Represented By: Andrew S Ulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?