Kuhn et al v. Slete et al
Plaintiff: Rick Spencer Kuhn and Joachim Perry
Defendant: Justin David Slete, Jane Doe Slete, John Korsmo Construction Inc. a Washington Corporation doing business as Korsmo Construction, Emerald City Moving and Storage LLC, United States of America, Department of the Interior, Justin Slete, John Korsmo Construction Inc a Washington Corporation doing business as Korsmo Construction, Emerald City Moving & Storage LLC and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv05489
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases by Judge Benjamin H. Settle, re #13 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Consolidate Cases filed by United States of America. IT IS ORDERED that this matter is consolidated with Case No. 3:21-cv-05537-BHS and that the Order Regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, Discovery, Depositions and Early Settlement in Case No. 3:21-cv-05537-BHS (Dkt. 11) supersedes the #3 Order in this matter. (AMD)
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Mark Carl Dean for Defendant John Korsmo Construction Inc from August 18 - 27, 2021. (Dean, Mark)
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristen R Vogel on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Vogel, Kristen)
August 9, 2021 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Consolidate Cases, filed by Defendant United States of America. Noting Date 8/9/2021, (Vogel, Kristen)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Rick Spencer Kuhn, Joachim Perry (Iodice, Mark)
July 30, 2021 Attorney Martin J Pujolar for John Korsmo Construction Inc added; per #10 Notice of Appearance. (AMD)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by John Korsmo Construction Inc (Dean, Mark)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark Carl Dean on behalf of Defendant John Korsmo Construction Inc. (Dean, Mark)
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Emerald City Moving & Storage and Justin & Jane Doe Slete on 7/12/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Rick Spencer Kuhn, Joachim Perry. (Iodice, Mark)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Emerald City Moving & Storage LLC mailed on 7/12/2021; Jane Doe Slete mailed on 7/12/2021; Justin Slete mailed on 7/12/2021 (Iodice, Mark) (Main Document 8 replaced with flattened copy of document on 7/23/2021) (AMD).
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on John Korsmo Construction Inc. on 7/15/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Rick Spencer Kuhn, Joachim Perry. (Iodice, Mark)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant John Korsmo Construction Inc mailed on 7/12/2021 (Iodice, Mark)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States of America on 7/9/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Rick Spencer Kuhn, Joachim Perry. (Iodice, Mark)
July 21, 2021 Attorney Michael Kutzner for Emerald City Moving & Storage LLC,Michael Kutzner for Jane Doe Slete,Michael Kutzner for Justin Slete added; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (AMD)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bryan D. Scholnick on behalf of Defendants Emerald City Moving & Storage LLC, Jane Doe Slete, Justin Slete. (Scholnick, Bryan)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 10/14/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/30/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/7/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Emerald City Moving and Storage LLC, John Korsmo Construction Inc, Jane Doe Slete, Justin Slete, and United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(SP)
July 9, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Personal Injuries and Damages and Jury Demand against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7156875) Attorney Mark Iodice added to party Rick Spencer Kuhn(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Iodice added to party Joachim Perry(pty:pla), filed by Rick Spencer Kuhn, Joachim Perry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Justin Slete, #3 Summons Jane Doe Slete, #4 Summons John Korsmo Construction, #5 Summons Emerald City Moving & Storage, #6 Summons United States of America)(Iodice, Mark) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/8/2021 to flatten malformed PDF) (KB). Modified on 7/12/2021 to update party filing is against (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuhn et al v. Slete et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Spencer Kuhn
Represented By: Mark Iodice
Represented By: Shane M. Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joachim Perry
Represented By: Mark Iodice
Represented By: Shane M. Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin David Slete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Slete
Represented By: Bryan D. Scholnick
Represented By: Michael Kutzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Korsmo Construction Inc. a Washington Corporation doing business as Korsmo Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerald City Moving and Storage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Slete
Represented By: Bryan D. Scholnick
Represented By: Michael Kutzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Korsmo Construction Inc a Washington Corporation doing business as Korsmo Construction
Represented By: Mark Carl Dean
Represented By: Martin J Pujolar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerald City Moving & Storage LLC
Represented By: Bryan D. Scholnick
Represented By: Michael Kutzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Kristen R Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?